U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificateds, Series 2006-2 v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificateds, Series 2006-2
Defendant: Derryn N. Jones, Dwight E Jones, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Dodeka LLC and Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00423
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 13 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/30/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 11 MOTION for Reconsideration be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/12/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 5 ). 1. This matter is REMANDED to the state court from which it was removed; 2. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), any appeal of this Order w ould not be taken in good faith and therefore Defendant Jones is denied leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Defendant may apply to proceed in forma pauperis in the Court of Appeals; and 3. This case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/13/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificateds, Series 2006-2 v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSMC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificateds, Series 2006-2
Represented By: Jennifer Nichole Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derryn N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodeka LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?