Kimber Baldwin Designs, LLC v. Silv Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimber Baldwin Designs, LLC
Defendant: Silv Communications, Inc. and John Doe Individuals/Companies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2016cv00448
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Settlement Approval. Class Counsel's motion for approval of attorneys' fees, expense reimbursement, and contribution awards 35 is GRANTED. This action and every Released Claim (including all individual claims and Class-wide claims presented thereby) is hereby DISMISSED on the merits and with prejudice, without fees or costs to any Party except as provided in the Settlement Agreement and adopted in this Order. This case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/13/17. (sct)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS (Doc. 18 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/15/2016. (mr)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 16 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/5/2016. (mr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimber Baldwin Designs, LLC v. Silv Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimber Baldwin Designs, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg
Represented By: Christian A Jenkins
Represented By: Todd B Naylor
Represented By: Robb S. Stokar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silv Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Individuals/Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?