McGirr et al v. Rehme et al
Plaintiff: Connie McGirr, Mary Ann Bailey, Debbie Carman-Staton, Patricia Gaunce, Norma Hall, Joyce Hanley, Alicia Roberts, Lisa Peek, Brenda Rentas, Wendy Fitch, Michelle Sharpe-Roberts, Corina Stearns, Stephanie Carter, Deborah Turner, Betty Jean Widner, Joyce A. Brown, Connie Centers, Linda Dunaway, Lucille Krey and Billie June Roberts
Defendant: Thomas F. Rehme, Waite, Schneider, Bayless, & Chesley Co., LPA and Stanley M. Chesley
Case Number: 1:2016cv00464
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Continuing Telephone Conference -, ( Joint Status Report of Remaining issues due by 1/29/2021.)Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Cleland.. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 1/4/21. (lgw)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 AGREED ORDER Authorizing Payment of Funds to Escrow Agent. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 1/14/2019. (lgw)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 AGREED JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendant Waite, Schneider, Bayless, & Chesley Co., LPA for unjust enrichment, plus interest, in the aggregate amount of $19,192.356.98 and PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Defendant's Waite, Schneider, Bayless, Chesley Co., LPA and Thomas F. Rehme and Thomas F Rehme, Trustee, Inc (See order for details). Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 10/3/2018. (lgw)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER STAYING case pending Settlement Negotiation and setting Telephone Status Conference for 8/29/2018 03:30 PM before Judge Robert H. Cleland. (THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL). Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 8/13/2018. (lgw)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 OPINION AND ORDER Resolving all pending motions. GRANTING 151 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Scheduling Order, Revised 26f Plan due by 8/17/2018 and a Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/29/2018 at 3:30 pm; DENYING AS MOOT 162 Eric Goe ring's Motion to Intervene and Appoint Receiver; GRANTING 170 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; GRANTING 174 Trustees' Motion to Nullify Substitution; DENYING AS MOOT 179 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Status Conference; GRANTING 180 Motion to Substitute Party by Trustee; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 99 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING 126 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 8/3/2018. (lgw)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to file a Response as to 165 Notice of Agreed Order Appointing Receiver and the 162 Motion to Intervene, Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Eric W Goering. Response due by 1/10/2018 . Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 12/26/17. (lgw)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Pending the Decision of the Sixth Circuit 101 Motion to Transfer all Sequestered Funds to the IRS; 115 Motion for Summary Judgment and 122 Motion to Strike Expert Affidavit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs ar e to file a Supplemental Brief by 9/1/2017, explaining the basis of the court's jurisdiction to hear the pending motions [99, 116, 126 and 151]; Defendants' Response to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 8/24/2017. (lgw)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Denying as Moot Defendants' 58 Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Motion; Denying as Moot Chesley's 72 Motion for Release of Funds; Granting Plaintiffs' 111 Motion to Dismiss Carol Boggs Without Prejudice; Denying as Moot Chesley's 105 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Setting Telephonic Status Conference., ( Telephonic Status Conference (The Court will initiate the call) set for 8/23/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Cleland.). Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 08/08/2017. (lgw)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; GRANTING 82 86 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and DENYING 97 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (See Order for Details). Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 4/21/2017. (lgw)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING 60 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint; DENYING without prejudice 13 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING without prejudice 14 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING as moot 27 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING as moot 43 Motion in Limine and DENYING as moot 52 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 12/20/2016. (lgw)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 87 Plaintiffs' Motion for Scheduling Conference, Directing the parties to meet and prepare a joint 26(f) plan to be filed by Plaintiffs no later than 1/6/2017 and Setting a Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 1/17/2017 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 12/13/2016. (lgw)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 EXTENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on October 17, 2016. (lgw)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert H. Cleland on 9/19/2016. (lgw)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Leave to File Depositions under seal. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 7/25/2016. (lgw)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER regarding hearing on pending motions. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 7/21/16. (lgw)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Directing Briefing, (Request/Motion for expanded TRO due by 7/6/2016.), ( Response due by 7/12/2016.). Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 7/1/2016. (lgw)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Status Conference, Extending Temporary Restraining Order and - Terminating without prejudice 29 MOTION to Deposit Funds (to Require Posting of Funds Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Submissions to Judge Sargus) ( Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 03:30 PM before Robert H. Cleland.). Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 6/8/2016. (lgw)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 5/23/16. (lgw)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding Expedited Third Party Discovery. Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 5/12/2016. (lgw)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Setting a Telephonic Status Conference on 4/29/2016 at 11:00 A.M. and the Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be (set for 5/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Columbus before Robert H. Cleland.). Signed by Robert H. Cleland on 4/22/16. (lgw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGirr et al v. Rehme et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie McGirr
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Bailey
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Carman-Staton
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gaunce
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Hall
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Hanley
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Roberts
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Peek
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Rentas
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Fitch
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sharpe-Roberts
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corina Stearns
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Carter
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Turner
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jean Widner
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce A. Brown
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Centers
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Dunaway
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Krey
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie June Roberts
Represented By: Christen M. Steimle
Represented By: Brian Scott Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Rehme
Represented By: Donald John Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waite, Schneider, Bayless, & Chesley Co., LPA
Represented By: Donald John Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley M. Chesley
Represented By: Vincent E Mauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?