September 21, 2018 |
Filing
101
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 95 Report and Recommendation granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 86 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; finding as moot 92 Motion to Strike ; granting 94 Motion to Strike; granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/21/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
95
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted; plaintiff's 86 MOTION for leave to file a response that exceeds (20) pages be Granted; defendants' 92 MOTION to Strike non-comporting declarations submitted in opposition to their motion for summary judgment be Denied as moot; defendants' 94 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's response to defendants' reply be Granted. Any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/13/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 31, 2018 |
Filing
75
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 52 Report and Recommendation denying 36 Motion; denying 37 Motion for Joinder;. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/31/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing
62
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 60 Report and Recommendation denying 55 Motion for Judicial Analysis. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/11/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
60
ORDER that the parties' 58 & 59 Motions to extend the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines are Granted. The case scheduled is modified as follows: Discovery deadline set for 12/18/2017, Dispositive Motion deadline set for 1/16/2018. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 55 MOTION for Judicial Analysis/Acknowledgment of Amended Pleading be Denied. ( Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/7/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified to clarify docket text on 12/7/2017 (jlw).
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing
52
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 36 MOTION for leave to proceed and for authorization and acceptance of filings be Denied, and that plaintiff's 37 MOTION for Joinder of parties-defendants be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/28/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
51
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 5 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/18/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing
48
ORDER that the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines set forth in the Court's Order dated 6/7/2017 47 are Stayed pending the District Judge's ruling on plaintiff's objections and further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/26/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 7, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting defendants' 44 Motion to extend the dispositive motion deadline and granting plaintiff's 38 & 45 Motions to extend the discovery deadline in this matter. The discovery deadline is extended to 8/7/2017 and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/7/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 3, 2017 |
Filing
34
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 24 Report and Recommendation denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/30/16. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting defendants' 22 Motion to Strike plaintiff's reply to defendants' answer. The Clerk is directed to strike plaintiff's 19 notification of defendants factitious denials in response to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/20/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 16, 2016 |
Filing
24
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 4 MOTION for a preliminary injunction should be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 9/2/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/16/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|