Clark v. Burke et al
Plaintiff: |
Carlos Clark |
Defendant: |
Daniel Burke and Jamie Ewen |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00547 |
Filed: |
May 13, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Timothy S. Black |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen L. Litkovitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 6, 2018 |
Filing
58
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED ST ATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 56 ) and TERMINATING THIS CASE IN THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/6/18. (jlm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 4, 2018 |
Filing
56
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 47 MOTION for Relief for Mistake be Denied as moot; plaintiff's 42 MOTION for Reconsideration of the order denying plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel be Denied as moot; and that defendants' 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted and plaintiff's excessive force claim against defendants Burke and Ewen in their individual capacities be Dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative reme dies. An appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/4/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER denying plaintiff's 35 Motion to compel, and denying plaintiff's 40 & 41 Motions to file discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/8/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 27, 2017 |
Filing
22
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 21 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/27/2017. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?