Hunter v. Attorney General of State of Ohio
Defendant: Attorney General State of Ohio
Petitioner: Tracie M. Hunter
Case Number: 1:2016cv00561
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 61 Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/30/19. (rrs)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Denied with prejudice. A certificate of appealability should issue only with respect to the prosecutorial misconduct claims in Ground One, which were address ed on the merits herein, challenging the prosecutor's remarks during rebuttal closing argument that were objected to at trial. On the other hand, a certificate of appealability should not issue with respect to the prosecutorial misconduct claim s alleged in Ground One, which this Court has concluded are waived and thus procedurally barred from review. Similarly, a certificate of appealability should not issue with respect to the claim alleged in Ground Three, which this Court has concluded is waived and thus procedurally barred from review. Finally, a certificate of appealability should not issue with respect to the claim alleged in Ground Two, which was addressed on the merits herein, because petitioner has not stated a "viable claim of the denial of a constitutional right," nor are the issues presented in that ground for relief "adequate to deserve encouragement to proceed further." Any appeal of this matter would be taken in good faith, and therefore should Grant petitioner leave to appeal in forma pauperis upon a showing of financial necessity. Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/9/2017. (art)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/19/2016. (mr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Attorney General of State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracie M. Hunter
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Branch
Represented By: Alphonse Adam Gerhardstein
Represented By: David A Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General State of Ohio
Represented By: Paul R. Kerridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?