Stuebing Automatic Machine Company v. Gavronsky et al
Plaintiff: Stuebing Automatic Machine Company
Defendant: Allan Gavronsky and Steve Lerma
Case Number: 1:2016cv00576
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is ORDERED that plaintiffs motions to dismiss defendantscounterclaims (Docs. 17 and 18) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/17/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 17 and 18 MOTIONS TO DISMISS defendants' counterclaims be Granted. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/20/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that plaintiff's 26 Motion to Strike is Denied. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Gavronsky's 22 MOTION for leave to file an amended counterclaim be Denied. ( Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/19/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying defendants' 11 , 14 , and 23 Motions to transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/16/2016. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuebing Automatic Machine Company v. Gavronsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuebing Automatic Machine Company
Represented By: Charles Hampton Brown, III
Represented By: Lisa M. A. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Gavronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lerma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?