Lentine v. Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Lentine and Joseph Lentine, III
Defendant: Chase Bank, Discover Financial and Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 1:2016cv00646
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Filing 36 Mail sent to Joseph Lentine, III, Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #34 Decision and Entry Adopting the Report and Recommendations and #35 Judgement. (bjc) Modified to Correct File Date on 5/19/2017 (bjc).
May 12, 2017 Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming #34 DECISION AND ENTRY. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 34 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING #32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/12/17. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 1, 2017 Filing 33 Mail Returned as "Vacant - Unable to Forward." Doc. #32 sent to Joseph Lentine, III. (eh)
April 10, 2017 Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings #29 be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/10/2017. (km) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 14, 2017 Filing 31 Mail Returned as "Attempted - Not Known. Return to Sender." Doc. #30 sent to Joseph Lentine III. (eh)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #29 Defendant Fifth Third Bank's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before 3/21/2017, why the Defendant Fifth Third Bank's motion for judgment on the pleadings #29 should not be construed as unopposed and granted for the reasons stated. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in a Report and Recommendation to the District Judge that the pending motion be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/1/2017. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 1, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Knerr, Allison)
December 7, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Joseph Lentine, III, Defendant Discover Financial (Turner-Bautista, Brooke) Modified to include plaintiff as filer on 12/8/2016 (eh).
December 6, 2016 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 11/17/2016 Minute Entry sent to Joesph Lentine, III (eh)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CALENDAR ORDER: Deadline to file motion to amend the pleadings and/or add parties set for 12/16/2016. Deadline to file motions relative to the pleadings set for 2/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure and report of plaintiff expert(s) set for 5/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure and report of defendant expert(s) set for 5/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure and report of rebuttal expert(s) set for 7/1/2017. Deadline for disclosure of lay witnesses set for 3/1/2017. Discovery deadline set for 9/1/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions set for 10/1/2017. The final pretrial and trial dates will be set on the calendar of Judge Black. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/17/2016. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 17, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2016. Plaintiff appeared pro se. Attorney Brooke Turner Baustista appeared on behalf of Defendant Discover Financial. Attorney Allison Knerr appeared on behalf of Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Calendar Order to follow. Parties to advise the Court if a mediation referral is requested. (km)
November 10, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE: Telephone Scheduling Conference RESET for 11/17/2016 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Counsel shall call 1-888-363-4749 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The conference access code is 8651321 and the security code is 2010. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference unless otherwise instructed. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/10/2016. Attorney Brooke Turner-Baustista appeared on behalf of Defendant Discover Financial. Attorney Allison Knerr appeared on behalf of Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Pro se Plaintiff did not appear; after being contacted by courtroom deputy, he advised the Court that he could not participate because of a medical condition and requested a continuance. The telephone scheduling conference is rescheduled to 11/17/2016 at 2:30 PM. (km)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS AGAINST CHASE BANK WITH PREJUDICE (Doc. #23 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/8/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 7, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Agreed by Plaintiff and Defendant Chase Bank U.S.A., N.A. to Remove Chase as a Party and Dismiss All Claims Against Chase with Prejudice by Defendant Chase Bank, Plaintiff Joseph Lentine, III. Responses due by 12/1/2016 (Oldham, Douglas) Modified to include plaintiff as filer on 11/8/2016 (eh).
October 19, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The parties shall call 1-888-363-4749 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The conference access code is 8651321 and the security code is 2010. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference unless otherwise instructed. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 18, 2016 Filing 21 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF THE PARTIES by Plaintiff, Defendants. (Oldham, Douglas) Modified to include all filers on 10/19/2016 (eh).
September 21, 2016 Filing 20 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/24/2016. (km) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 20, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Discover Financial. (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Defendant Discover Financial's Motion for Extension of Time Until 9/21/2016 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Counsel is reminded to comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.3(a) regarding the filing of all future motions for extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/25/2016. (km) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 25, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint New date requested 9/21/2016. by Defendant Discover Financial. Responses due by 9/19/2016 (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
August 25, 2016 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Discover Financial. (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
August 25, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke D Turner-Bautista for Defendant Discover Financial (Turner-Bautista, Brooke)
August 17, 2016 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Chase Bank served on 7/19/2016, answer due 8/9/2016; Discover Financial served on 7/19/2016, answer due 8/9/2016; Fifth Third Bank served on 7/18/2016, answer due 8/8/2016. (eh)
August 10, 2016 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Chase Bank. (Oldham, Douglas)
August 10, 2016 Filing 13 Chase Bank USA, N.A.'s ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Chase Bank. (Oldham, Douglas)
August 10, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Oldham for Defendant Chase Bank (Oldham, Douglas)
August 5, 2016 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Knerr, Allison)
August 5, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Knerr for Defendant Fifth Third Bank (Knerr, Allison)
August 5, 2016 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Knerr, Allison)
July 19, 2016 Filing 8 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. #7 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/19/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 30, 2016 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/30/16. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Plaintiffs #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 7/18/2016. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 30, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank, Discover Financial, Fifth Third Bank. Sent to the US Marshal for service with USM-285 forms and copies of the Complaint and Order for Service. (eh)
June 30, 2016 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed by Joseph Lentine, III against Chase Bank, Discover Financial, Fifth Third Bank. (eh)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering that the above captioned complaint be filed. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, the summons, and this Order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis upon the Defendant as directed by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/30/2016. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/17/16. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 16, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Joseph Lentine, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (eh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2016: #1 Ex. A-B) (eh).
June 15, 2016 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Lentine, III. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lentine v. Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lentine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Douglas M. Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial
Represented By: Brooke D Turner-Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Allison Knerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?