Moore v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: John C. Moore
Defendant: Donald Morgan, Gary Mohr, Keith Fellure, Anthony Cadogan, Charles Miller, Linnea Mahlman, Brad Dyer, Preston Messer, Luke Vansickle, Matt Patrick, John Doe, John Doe Supervisor, Joe Hale, Antonio Lee, Michael Maughmer, Dept. of Rehabilitation & Correction and Dept of Ohio State Highway Patrol
Case Number: 1:2016cv00655
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: MAHONING
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION AND ORDER overruling 95 Moore's Objections, adopting 99 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, and granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of the Defendants. This Court also agrees with the Magistrate Judge&# 039;srecommendation that any appeal may not proceed in forma pauperis, as that appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 8/21/20. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly. plaintiff's complaint against defendants Morgan, Dean, Galloway and Osborne are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of service. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 12/31/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Clarification; granting in part 62 Motion for Discovery; granting 65 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/26/18. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER adopting 60 Report and Recommendations, accordingly, defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/8/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 45 MOTION TO DISMISS be Denied; and that defendants' counsel be granted an extension of time until (20) days after any Order adopting this R&R to file a responsive pleading on behalf of defenda nts Hoover and Crabtree. Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/12/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that plaintiff's 51 Motion for Reconsideration is Denied ; and that the new defendants' 55 Motion to Stay discovery pending a decision on their motion to dismiss the amended complaint is Granted. Discovery will not proceed on t he claims against the new defendants until the motion to dismiss the amended complaint is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/8/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying plaintiff's 34 Motion to Compel and 35 Motion for clarification. Defendants' 44 Motion to Stay is Denied. The discovery deadline is extended to 12/8/2017 and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to 1/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/8/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying plaintiff's 22 Motion for a telephone conference; and denying plaintiff's 23 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/30/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is Ordered that plaintiff's claims against the Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction (ODRC), the Ohio Highway State Patrol (OHSP), Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correctional Direc tor Gary Mohr, Keith Fellure, Sgt. Michael Maughmer, Charles Miller, Linnea Mahlman, Joe Hale, and Antonio Lee be DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/16/2016. (jee)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified docket text to correct spelling error on 9/16/2016 (jee).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Fellure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Cadogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnea Mahlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Vansickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Maughmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of Rehabilitation & Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Ohio State Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?