Enoch v. Hamilton County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Enoch
Defendant: Hamilton County Sheriff's Office, Deputy Sheriff Hogan, Deputy Sheriff Nobles, Jim Neil and Unknown County Deputy Sheriffs
Case Number: 1:2016cv00661
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: BUTLER
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER that 1. Plaintiff Avery Corbins motion for judgment notwithstanding the verdict 158 is DENIED; 2. Defendants motion for judgment as a matter of law 163 is DENIED; and 3. Defendant must file any response to plaintiff Enochs motion for attorney fees 162 no later than TWENTY-ONE DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/9/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/9/2022. (art)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER that Plaintiffs motion in limine 133 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Neither plaintiffs nor defendant will reference the Sixth Circuits probable cause finding during voir dire or opening statements; Defendants motion in limine to exclude testimony related to Judge Nadels recording ban statements 136 is GRANTED; Defendants motion in limine to exclude testimony related to racial animus 137 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/2/2022. (art)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 127 Plaintiffs motion in limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/2/2021. (art)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER that the briefing schedule set out in this Courts Order of July 27, 2021 123 is hereby stayed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court on September 24, 2021, advising the Court as to whether the case has settled. In the event the case has not settled, the Joint Status Report shall include proposed dates to complete the briefing set out in the Courts Order of July 27, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/7/2021. (art)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that the County defendants motion to dismiss/motion for summary judgment 112 is GRANTED as to (1) all remaining claims against defendants Nobles and Hogan in their individual capacity, and (2) all remaining official capacity claims against de fendants Hamilton County Sheriffs Office, Hamilton County Sheriff Jim Neil, and Nobles and Hogan (which are construed as claims against Hamilton County), with the exception of plaintiffs official capacity claim for speech-based retaliation under the First Amendment. The County defendants motion to dismiss/motion for summary judgment 112 is DENIED as to plaintiffs official capacity claim against Hamilton County for speech-based retaliation under the First Amendment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/1/2021. (art)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that the Court Denies defendants' 83 Motion for Summary Judgment in all respects; Grants plaintiffs' 84 Motion for Summary judgment on plaintiffs' First and Fourth Amendment claims (Counts I, II, and III); and Denies defendants' 92 Motion for sanctions for spoliation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/19/2019. (art)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER 1. Denying as Moot 40 defendants Wolfzorn, Knight, Ferguson and Horton's Motion to Dismiss. 2. Defendants' 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is Granted as to: Plaintiffs' claims against all defendants u nder Count IV- Excessive Force-Fourth amendment; Count VII- State Law Claims: Malicious Prosecution; Court IX-State Law Claim: False Imprisonment/False Arrest; and Count XI-State Law Claim: Assault and Battery. Plaintiffs' claims against defend ant Neil in his individual capacity. 3. Defendants' 41 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings is Denied as to: Plaintiffs' 1983 claims against defendant Neil in his official capacity and defendants Hogan and Nobles in their individ ual capacity under Count 1-Violation of Free Speech Rights-First and Fourteenth Amendments; Count II- Violation of Fourth Amendment Rights; Count III-False Arrest/Unlawful Detention/False Imprisonment-Fourth amendment; and Count V-Malicious Prosecuti on-Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments. Plaintiffs' claim against defendant Neil in his official capacity under Count VI-Ratification-Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments. Plaintiffs' claims under Count VIII-State Law Claim: Negligent and Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress, and Count X-State Law Claim: Invasion of Privacy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/18/2017. (art)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying as Moot plaintiff Vanessa Enoch's 46 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing; and denying as Moot 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/28/2017. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enoch v. Hamilton County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Enoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Robert A. Florez
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Hogan
Represented By: Robert A. Florez
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Nobles
Represented By: Robert A. Florez
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Neil
Represented By: Robert A. Florez
Represented By: Jerome A Kunkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown County Deputy Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?