Bruce v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laura J Bruce
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00758
Filed: July 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER 21 adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/20/2018. (jlw)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the parties 19 joint stipulation for an award of attorney fees be Granted and plaintiff be awarded a total of $5,300.00 in attorney fees and costs under the EAJA. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/17/2018. (art)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings. This case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/11/17. (gs)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the decision of the Commissioner be Reversed and Remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/7/2017. (art)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura J Bruce
Represented By: James Roy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?