November 20, 2018 |
Filing
93
ORDER ADOPTING ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, whereupon this case is TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/20/2018. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 1, 2018 |
Filing
91
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that summary judgment be Granted in favor of defendants Combs and Nolan and that plaintiff's claims against defendants Combs and Nolan be Dismissed without prejudice for f ailure to exhaust administrative remedies. It is further Recommended that any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith. Objections to Supplemental R&R due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/1/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 3, 2018 |
Filing
84
ORDER denying plaintiff's 82 Motion to Appoint Counsel. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Irvin and Scott's 72 MOTION to Dismiss be Granted and the claims of these defendant be Dismissed under FRCP 4(m) for lack of service; Pla intiff's 83 MOTION for default judgment be Denied; plaintiff's 58 MOTION for Partial summary judgment against defendant Oppy be Denied; Defendants' 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment be Granted and that plaintiff's claims agains t Hale, Fri, and Hutchinson related to the alleged April 2016 incidents be Dismissed with prejudice and the remaining claims against these defendants and against defendants Cool, Miller, Dawson, Mahlman and Oppy be Dismissed without prejudice for fai lure to exhaust administrative remedies. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/3/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
69
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 64 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/6/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing
63
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Cool's 44 MOTION TO DISMISS be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/23/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER denying as Moot plaintiff's 54 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/7/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER that defendant Oppy's 53 Motion to Stay the deadline to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment is Granted. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 51 Motion for partial summary judgment be Denied wit hout prejudice to resubmission after discovery in this case has been completed. ( Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/8/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
43
ORDER that plaintiff's 36 Motion for appointment of counsel is Denied; plaintiff's 35 Motion to extend the 3/17/2017 deadline for issuing summons to defendants Irvin and Scott is Denied as moot; defendants' 37 Motion to stay the responsive pleading deadline is Denied. Defendants shall have until 6/7/2017 to file a response to plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff's 39 Motion to require defendants to file an answer is Denied as moot; defendants' 41 Motion to s tay the deadline to respond to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment is Granted. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 38 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment be Denied without prejudice to re-submission after discovery in this case has been completed; and that plaintiff's 42 MOTION for Default Judgment against all defendants be Denied. ( Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/18/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER that plaintiff show cause within (14) days of the date of this Order, why this case should not be dismissed as to newly-named defendants Officers Scott and Irvin for failure to comply with the Court's order of 2/1/2017. Defendant's [ 27] Motion to Stay the responsive pleading deadline is granted. Defendants shall have until 3/22/2017 to file a responsive pleading to the original and supplemental complaints. Plaintiff's show cause response due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/1/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting defendants 23 Motion to Stay discovery. Discovery is Stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/2/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Filing
24
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 20 ). Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunction (Doc. 17 ) is DENIED; the deadline for Plaintiff to submit a copy of his original compla int and his supplemental complaint, a summons form, and a United States Marshal Form for each of the newly named Defendants in his motion for supplementary complaint (Doc. 17 ) is POSTPONED to 14 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff's su bmitted forms shall reflect the changed identification of new Defendants as reflected in Plaintiff's objections to the report and recommendation (Doc. 22 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/1/2017. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 17 MOTION for preliminary injunction be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 1/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/17/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing
13
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 11 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/5/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|