Ogg v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Ogg
Defendant: James M Clark, Greg Holdren and Brian Nolan
Case Number: 1:2016cv00816
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTATION ORDER granting the parties Joint 63 Motion to Stay proceedings pending settlement discussions for a period of (60) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/12/2019. (art)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 43 Report and Recommendation denying 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/22/18. (ba)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendants' 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/6/2018. (art)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting defendants' 23 Motion to Stay the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines; and denying as Moot plaintiff's 26 Motion to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/15/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying as Moot defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss the original complaint for Failure to State a Claim and 17 Motion to stay the deadline to file a reply memorandum; and granting plaintiff's 15 Motion for leave to Amend his com plaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's amended complaint (Docs. 15-1 and 15-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/3/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogg v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Holdren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?