Medpace, Inc. v. InspireMD, Inc.
Plaintiff: Medpace, Inc.
Defendant: InspireMD, Inc., InspireMD, Ltd., and and InspireMD, Inc. also known as and doing business as InspireMD, LTD
Case Number: 1:2016cv00830
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the pending motions (Docs. 35, 44, 45) be, and are hereby, DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 04/25/2019. (bjc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION of Dismissal As to All Claims and Counterclaims by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties proceed to mediation and file a status report on or before May 31, 2019, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 03/08/2019. (bjc)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. #35 ), plaintiffs motion to deny defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. #44 ), and plaintiffs motion to strike the declaration of Jonathan Pressment (Doc. #45 ) be, and are hereby, TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 01/29/2019. (bjc)
January 29, 2019 Minute Entry - This matter is before the Court on (1) defendants motion for summary judgment as to plaintiffs affirmative claims for relief (Doc. 35), (2) plaintiffs motion to deny defendants motion for summary judgment, or alternatively, to defer considering the motion until further discovery is complete (Doc. 44), and (3) plaintiffs motion to strike the declaration of Jonathan Pressment (Doc. 45). The Court heard oral argument on these motions via a telephone conference on Thursday, January 24, 2019. Jeffrey McSherry represented the plaintiff and Jonathan Pressment and Ted Martin represented the defendant. Court reporter Joan Averdick recorded the proceedings.For the reasons stated on the record, the parties arguments are well taken, and the Court will take this matter under submission and issue a written opinion at a later date. (Court Reporter: Joan Averdick) (bjc)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the oral argument hearing scheduled for Thursday, January 3, 2019 at 1:00 p.m., be, and hereby is, continued to THURSDAY, JANUARY 24, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M. VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 01/03/2019. (bjc)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on said motions (Docs. #35 , #44 , #45 ) be, and is hereby, SET FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 3, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M. IN ROOM 203 OF THE POTTER STEWART UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, CINCINNATI, OHIO. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/30/2018. (bjc)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Defendant's Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery and Case Management Deadlines. Provision number 3 of this Court's 3/9/2018 Order staying discovery and certain deadlines #41 shall be amended to provide that the stay of discovery shall not be lifted until 3 business days after the entry of an order adjudicating Defendant's motion for summary judgment #35 . The dates set forth in provision 4 of the 3/9/2018 Order are set aside. New dates shall be set, if necessary, following entry of an order adjudicating the Motion. The remaining provisions of the 3/9/2018 Order shall remain in effect to the extent applicable, including the provision allowing the parties to seek or oppose further extensions of the stay if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/9/2018. (km)
August 9, 2018 Filing 57 Defendant's Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery and Case Management Deadlines by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted) Modified Docket Text to Clarify on 8/9/2018 (km).
July 9, 2018 Set/Reset Cincinnati PPTO Deadlines: Per Order #56 , the deadlines contained in the Order of 3/9/2018 #41 are extended as follows: The dates by which expert witnesses shall be identified and furnish reports shall be extended for both parties until 10/29/2018, with a corresponding deadline of 12/3/2018 for rebuttal experts. All discovery to be completed by 1/7/2019. Any summary judgment motions shall be filed not later than 2/11/2019. (km)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery and Case Management Deadlines. Accordingly, provision number 3 of this Court's 3/9/2018 Order staying discovery and certain deadlines #41 shall be amended to provide that the stay of discovery shall not be lifted until the earlier of: (1) three (3) days after the entry of an order adjudicating Defendant's motion for summary judgment #35 ; or (2) 8/13/2018. Provision number 4 of this Court's 3/9/2018 Order shall be amended to provide an extension for an equal duration of the deadlines set forth therein. The remaining provisions of the 3/9/2018 Order shall remain in effect to the extent applicable, including the provision allowing the parties to seek or oppose further extensions of the stay if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/9/2018. (km)
July 6, 2018 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/13/2018. to Stay Discovery and Case Management Deadlines by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Extend) (Martin, Ted)
June 11, 2018 Set/Reset Cincinnati PPTO Deadlines: Per Order #54 , the deadlines contained in the Order of 3/9/2018 #41 are extended as follows: The dates by which expert witnesses shall be identified and furnish reports shall be extended for both parties until 9/24/2018, with a corresponding deadline of 10/29/2018 for rebuttal experts. All discovery to be completed by 12/5/2018. Any summary judgment motions shall be filed not later than 1/9/2019. (km)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery and Case Management Deadlines. Accordingly, provision number 3 of this Court's 3/9/2018 Order staying discovery and certain deadlines #41 shall be amended to provide that the stay of discovery shall not be lifted until the earlier of: (1) three (3) days after the entry of an order adjudicating Defendant's motion for summary judgment #35 ; or (2) 7/11/2018. Provision number 4 of this Court's 3/9/2018 Order shall be amended to provide an extension for an equal duration of the deadlines set forth therein. The remaining provisions of the 3/9/2018 Order shall remain in effect to the extent applicable, including the provision allowing the parties to seek or oppose further extensions of the stay if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/11/2018. (km)
June 8, 2018 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #41 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery and Case Management Deadlines by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/30/2018. (km)
April 25, 2018 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION for Order to Deny, pursuant to Rule 56(d), InspireMD's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, to all sufficient discovery to be conducted prior considering InspireMD's Motion filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Order to Strike the Declaration of Jonathon Pressment filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION for Order to Deny, pursuant to Rule 56(d), InspireMD's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, to all sufficient discovery to be conducted prior considering InspireMD's Motion filed by Counter Claimant InspireMD, Ltd., Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
April 11, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Order to Strike the Declaration of Jonathon Pressment filed by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan Pressment, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan Pressment, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jonathan Pressment, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jonathan Pressment, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Jonathan Pressment, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Jonathan Pressment) (Martin, Ted)
April 4, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Plaintiff's Affirmative Claims for Relief filed by Defendants InspireMD, Inc., InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
March 21, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Plaintiff's Affirmative Claims for Relief filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Wynne Declaration, #2 Exhibit Master Serivces Agreement, #3 Exhibit Task Order No. 1, #4 Exhibit Medpace Termination Notice to InspireMD, #5 Exhibit Deborah Schmalz Kern Declaration, #6 Exhibit Stephen Ewald Declaration, #7 Exhibit Medpace Notice of Termination to InspireMD) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Order to Strike the Declaration of Jonathon Pressment by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Order to Deny, pursuant to Rule 56(d), InspireMD's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, to all sufficient discovery to be conducted prior considering InspireMD's Motion by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey P. Mcsherry, #2 Exhibit InspireMD Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit InspireMD Responses and Objections to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit InsprieMD Responses and Objections to Requests for Production, #5 Exhibit Subpoena to InspireMD, Inc., #6 Exhibit Subpoena to HCRI) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to file memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before March 21, 2018 and Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of its motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before April 4, 2018. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 03/13/2018. (bjc)
March 12, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/21/2018. by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2018 Set/Reset Cincinnati PPTO Deadlines: Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 8/24/2018. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 9/28/2018. Defendant Primary Expert due by 8/24/2018. Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 9/28/2018. Discovery due by 11/5/2018. Dispositive Motions not directed to pleadings due by 12/8/2018. (km)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER conditionally granting in part #37 Defendant's Motion to Stay All Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines, as otherwise indicated in this Order. So that discovery may quickly resume following disposition of the pending motion for summary judgment, Inspire must respond to the following: (a) Inspire shall enter into an agreed protective order with Medpace regarding future discovery, on or before 4/30/2018 regarding future document production; and (b) Inspire shall respond to Medpace's inquiries regarding which, if any, of the fifteen individuals identified by Inspire with knowledge of its claims may have scheduled travel in the United States in the coming months. Discovery shall be stayed only for three months, until 6/11/2018, with all corresponding pretrial deadlines to be simultaneously extended. The dates by which expert witnesses shall be identified and furnish reports shall be extended for both parties until 8/24/2018, with a corresponding deadline of 9/28/2018 for rebuttal experts, and with all discovery to be completed by 11/5/2018. Any summary judgment motions shall be filed not later than December 8, 2018. If either party believes a further stay or extension of discovery is required, or any other dispute arises that relates to this Order, the parties are to fully exhaust extrajudicial efforts to resolve their dispute prior to seeking intervention from this Court. If unable to resolve the dispute extrajudicially, they must contact Bowman_Chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov, or the undersigned's deputy clerk Kevin Moser at 513-564-7680 to request a telephonic status conference before filing a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/9/2018. (km)
March 8, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Case Management Deadlines filed by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
March 6, 2018 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Case Management Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #37 MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Case Management Deadlines. Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/6/2018 at 12:00 PM. Defendant's Reply due by 3/8/2018 at 5:00 PM. (km)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #38 Defendant's Motion to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Stay Discovery and All Case Management Deadlines. The Court establishes the following briefing schedule: (1) Plaintiff's response is due no later than 3/6/2018 at Noon. Defendant's reply is due no later than 3/8/2018 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/1/2018. (km)
February 28, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for a Stay by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jonathan D. Pressment, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - Feb. 27 email, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
February 28, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Case Management Deadlines by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jonathon D. Pressmant, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Answer and Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit C - Master Services Agreement, #6 Exhibit D - Task Order, #7 Exhibit E - MOL ISO Inspire SJ, #8 Exhibit F - Medpace First Set of Requests for Production of Docs, #9 Exhibit G - Medpace First Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit H - Medpace Second Set of Requests for Docs, #11 Exhibit I - Medpace Second Set of Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit J - Medpace Depo Requests, #13 Exhibit K - Jan 10 Email, #14 Exhibit L - Inspire First Set of Requests for Production of Docs, #15 Exhibit M - Inspire First Requests for Interrogatories, #16 Exhibit N - Medpace Objections to Inspire First Set of Interrogatories, #17 Exhibit O - Medpace Objections to Inspire First Set of Requests for Docs, #18 Exhibit P - Medpace Suppl Objections to Inspire First Set of Interrogatories, #19 Exhibit Q - Jan 22 Email, #20 Exhibit R - Medpace Website, #21 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
February 21, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd. re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Plaintiff's Affirmative Claims for Relief of Filing Signature Page regarding Memorandum in Support (Martin, Ted)
February 21, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to Plaintiff's Affirmative Claims for Relief by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration of Jonathan D. Pressment, Esq., #3 Exhibit A-Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-Answer and Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit C-Reply to Counterclaims, #6 Exhibit D-Master Services Agreement, #7 Exhibit E-Task Order, #8 Exhibit F-Inspire Termination Notice, #9 Exhibit G-Medpace Letter, #10 Exhibit H-Rule 26(a) Disclosure, #11 Exhibit I-Objections and Responses Roggs, #12 Exhibit J-Objections and Responses Doc, #13 Exhibit K-Supp. Rogg Responses, #14 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the course of this litigation: Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2018., Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 5/25/2018., Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 6/29/2018., Defendant Primary Expert due by 5/25/2018., Defendant Rebuttal Expert due by 6/29/2018., Discovery due by 8/3/2018., Motions not directed to pleadings due by 9/7/2018., Settlement Conference TBD., Final Pretrial Conference TBD., Trial TBD. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 12/14/2017. (bjc)
December 8, 2017 Filing 33 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 & #31 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan David Pressment and William Alessandro Feldman. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/22/17. (eh)
November 20, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6212417) of William Feldman by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing) (Martin, Ted)
November 20, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6212406) of Jonathan Pressment by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Martin, Ted)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/16/17. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/8/2017. (eh) Modified on 11/16/2017 (eh).
October 20, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #26 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by All Plaintiffs. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2017 Reset Deadlines per doc. #27 : Medpace, Inc. answer due 10/20/2017. (eh)
September 20, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Defendant's Counterlcaim by Counter Defendant Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Medpace, Inc. filed by InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Master Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Task Order, #3 Exhibit C-Wayback Machine, #4 Exhibit D-Termination Notice) (Martin, Ted)
August 25, 2017 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Reply, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Second Amended Complaint by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 08/11/2017. (bjc)
July 24, 2017 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
July 10, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
June 5, 2017 Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against InspireMD, Ltd., filed by Medpace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit contract, #2 Exhibit Notice of Termination) (McSherry, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 6/6/2017 (eh).
May 17, 2017 Reset Deadlines: Second Amended Complaint due by 6/5/2017. (eh)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint within fifteen (15) days of entry of this Order, curing the deficiencies discussed herein. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/17/17. (eh)
March 16, 2017 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM The First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Martin, Ted)
March 3, 2017 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 16] Response in Opposition to Motion - restricted at request of counsel for filing error. Counsel properly refiled as #17 Response in Opposition to Motion. (eh)
March 2, 2017 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM The First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Termination Notice) (McSherry, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2017 Filing 16 [FORMER DOC. 16 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.]RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM The First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Termination Notice) (McSherry, Jeffrey) Modified docket text and document security on 3/3/2017 (eh).
February 10, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM The First Amended Complaint by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer InspireMD, Ltd. answer due 2/10/2017. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 12/21/16. (eh)
December 20, 2016 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 2/10/2017. by Defendant InspireMD, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and defendant InspireMD, Inc. be, and is hereby, TERMINATED AS A PARTY HEREIN. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/25/2016. (jee)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/28/2016. (jee)
September 27, 2016 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to InspireMD, Ltd. on 9/27/2016, answer due 12/27/2016. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2016 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. Responses due by 10/21/2016 (McSherry, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2016 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Medpace, Inc.. (McSherry, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2016 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES filed by Medpace, Inc. against InspireMD, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit contract) (McSherry, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 9/13/2016 (eh).
September 7, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant InspireMD, Inc.. Responses due by 10/3/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Affidavit of Craig Shore, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Craig Shore, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Craig Shore, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Martin, Ted)
August 16, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted Thomas Martin for Defendant InspireMD, Inc. (Martin, Ted)
August 16, 2016 Reset Deadlines per doc. #4 : InspireMD, Inc. answer due 9/7/2016. (eh)
August 15, 2016 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Reply, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint by Defendant InspireMD, Inc., Plaintiff Medpace, Inc. (Martin, Ted) Modified to include plaintiff as filer on 8/16/2016 (eh).
August 11, 2016 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against InspireMD, Inc., filed by Medpace, Inc. Filed in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas as case number A1603929 on 7/12/2016. (jlw)
August 11, 2016 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
August 10, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant InspireMD, Inc.. (Martin, Ted)
August 10, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1603929 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5609427), filed by InspireMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Classification Form, #3 Exhibit C-Written Request for Service, #4 Exhibit D-Summons, #5 Exhibit E-Summons, #6 Exhibit F-Service Return, #7 Exhibit G-Entry, #8 Exhibit H-Notice of Filing, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medpace, Inc. v. InspireMD, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InspireMD, Inc.
Represented By: Ted Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InspireMD, Ltd.
Represented By: William A. Feldman
Represented By: Ted Thomas Martin
Represented By: Jonathan Pressment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and
Represented By: Ted Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InspireMD, Inc. also known as and doing business as InspireMD, LTD
Represented By: Ted Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medpace, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?