Miller v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: |
Wayne Anthony Miller |
Defendant: |
Ryan Bowers, Jason Eaches, John Raredan and Medical Staff Personel |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00852 |
Filed: |
August 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan J. Dlott |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen L. Litkovitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
35
ORDER ADOPTING 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiffs case is DISMISSED in its entirety for want of prosecution, for lack of service and failure to obey an Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/4/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
34
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's case be Dismissed in its entirety for want of prosecution, for lack of service, and for failure to obey an Order of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/19/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott denying 15 Motion to Amend/Correct; adopting Report and Recommendations re 18 ; defendant Rardin's motion for leave to file an untimely response to plaintiff's motions is DENIED as MOOT. (vp)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
June 12, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER denying plaintiff's 23 Motion to Compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/12/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER adopting 4 Report and Recommendations : Plaintiff may proceed with claims against defendants Bowers, Eaches and Raredan based on their alleged use of excessive force against plaintiff in an incident that purportedly occurred on April 25, 201 6 at SOCF. Plaintiff may also proceed with his cause of action under §1983 against defendant Bowers and Eaches based on their alleged refusal to allow plaintiff to receive medical treatment following that incident. In addition, defendant SOCF medical person[n]el are dismissed as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/21/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?