Pullen v. Conschafsky et al
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Pullen
Defendant: Conschafsky, Ron Erdos, Cool, C. Davis, Oppy, Toppins, Spears, Cassner, Mahlman, Clagg, Jane Doe Nurse, Sammons, Larry Green, Sears and Broughton
Case Number: 1:2016cv00894
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Michael R. Barrett
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 95 Report and Recommendation dismissing complaint without prejudice for failure of service. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/8/19. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 93 Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice against defendants Cool, Davis,Erdos, Ford, Goodman, Mahlman, Nolan, Parsons, Prise, and Toppins for want of prosecution and for failure to obey an Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/14/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that because plaintiff has failed to respond to the Court's 11/20/2018 show cause order and plaintiff has not shown good cause for failure to serve the complaint on defendant Conschafsky, that plaintiff's complaint against defendant Conschafsky be Dismissed without prejudice for failure of service and this entire case be Closed on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/10/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 91 Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's complaint against defendants Spears, Summers, Lahr, and Seal be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of service. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 11/5/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations (Doc. 53 ); Plaintiff's Motion, (Doc. 48 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/25/2018. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 60 Motion to reissue service on eight unserved defendants ; and granting plaintiff's 61 Motion to extend the discovery deadline in this matter. Plaintiff's motion to reserve defendant Toppins is Denied. However, plaintiff's motion is Granted with respect to the seven remaining unserved defendants. To the extent that these defendants are former employees of SOCF, It Is Ordered that the Office of the Attorney Gener al shall file under seal the last know home address of defendants Conschafsky, Summers, Spears, Prise, Seal, Nolan, and Lahr within (14) days. It is further Ordered the the USM shall serve a copy of the summons and amended complaint on defendants Co nschafsky, Summers, Spears, Prise, Seal, Nolan, and Lahr via certified mail at the address provided by the Ohio Attorney General's Office, and the Return of Service shall be filed under seal. The discovery deadline is hereby extended to 6/14/20 18 and the deadline for both parties to file dispositive motions in this matter is extended to 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/15/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified to correct docket text on 3/15/2018 (art).
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 59 Report and Recommendation denying 51 and 52 Motions for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/27/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 8 and 31 Report and Recommendation denying as moot 17 Objections and denying 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File and striking 56 Objections. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/8/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 2/8/2018 (ba) to edit text and regenerate a NEF.
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 51 & 52 MOTIONS for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining orders be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/4/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying plaintiff's 40 Motion to Stay pending hunger strike; and denying as Moot plaintiff's 44 Motion for leave to stay proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 8/31/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying as Moot plaintiff's 23 Motion to Stay proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/13/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullen v. Conschafsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conschafsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Erdos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toppins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?