Dyess v. Mullins et al
Plaintiff: |
Sir Michael Dyess |
Defendant: |
Neil Mullins, C/O Gifford, R/N Joiner and John Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00910 |
Filed: |
September 8, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephanie K. Bowman |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan J. Dlott |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
55
ORDER ADOPTING 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS The Court ADOPTS 53 Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, defendants motion for summary judgment 44 is GRANTED. This case is hereby TERMINATED from the Courts docket. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/20/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
53
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendants' motion for summary judgment 44 be GRANTED, and that this case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/16/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 29 36 Plaintiff's Motions to Further Amend Complaint, denying 30 37 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery; granting 38 Plaintiff's Motion for a Sixty-Day Extension of Dispositive Motion D eadline. The deadline for either party to file a dispositive motion is extended to 10/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/1/2017. (km) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 10, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Issue Service. The Clerk of Court shall amend the record to substitute the newly identified Defendants, Lt. Setty and Correctional Officer Bauer, in place of the previous two Defendants identified only as John Doe. The USMS shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this Order upon Defendants Lt. Setty and C/O Bauer as directed by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanc ed by the United States; denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief; denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Evidentiary Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/10/2017. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?