Lester v. Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Lester
Defendant: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections and DeAnn Osgood
Case Number: 1:2016cv01065
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECISION AND ENTRY adopting the Reports and Recommendations (Docs. 31, 51); granting Defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. 52); Defendant's objection (Doc. 53) is overruled; Plaintiff's motions for default judgment (Docs. 15, 21) are denied; Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 36) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/28/19. (rrs)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that defendant's 45 MOTION to strike plaintiff's sur-reply memorandum is Granted; and plaintiff's 46 & 47 request[s] for leave to file answers to defendant's allegations with respect to plaintiff's motion to strik e are Denied. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that defendant Osgood's 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be Granted in part to the extent plaintiff's alleged claims of sexual abuse include discrete acts pre-dating November 9, 1994, an d defendant Osgood's 36 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be Denied in all other respects. ( Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/24/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying plaintiff's 32 Motion for relief. Plaintiff's 39 Motion to Strike discovery from the record is Granted. The Clerk is Directed to strike documents 33 & 34 from the docket. Plaintiff's 49 Motion for clarification is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/13/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting defendant Osgood's 42 Motion to Stay discovery. The discovery and dispositive motion deadlines are Stayed pending resolution of defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/8/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that plaintiff's 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Denied. Plaintiff's 27 Motion for ruling on his second motion for appointment of counsel is Denied as moot. Defendant Osgood's 30 Motion for Leave to File surreply to pl aintiff's motion to appoint counsel is Denied as moot. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's 15 & 21 MOTIONS for Default Judgment. ( Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 6/12/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying plaintiff's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; and denying plaintiff's 13 Motion to Compel. The Ohio Attorney General is Ordered to submit under seal to the Clerk of Court, within (14) days of the date of this Order, a curr ent address where defendant DeAnn Osgood may be served with process. The Ohio Attorney General shall file a notice of compliance with the Court after he has fulfilled this requirement. The Clerk is Directed not to post defendant Osgood's addre ss on the public docket and to redact any documents submitted for filing that bear defendant Osgood's address. Further, the Clerk is Directed to ensure service upon defendant Osgood of all documents filed by plaintiff. The Clerk shall mail any documents filed by plaintiff to defendant Osgood at the address provided by the Ohio Attorney General, which shall be kept under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/27/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 7 ). Plaintiff's claim against the Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/15/2016. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAnn Osgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?