McDougald v. Erdos et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerone McDougald |
Defendant: |
Ron Erdos, William Cool, Brad Dyer, Ryan Andre and John Doe Nurse |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00095 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephanie K. Bowman |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan J. Dlott |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
56
ORDER ADOPTING 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, plaintiff/appellant's motion for leave to proceed informa pa11peris ona ppeal (Docs. 47, 48, 52, and 53) is DENJED. Plaintiff/appellant is assessed the filing fee and given thirty days within which to pay the fee. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/14/2019. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
September 11, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. 22) is GRANTED. All remaining pending motions (Doc. 38) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/11/208. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 9, 2018 |
Filing
39
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendants' motion forsummary judgment 22 be GRANTED, all remaining pending motions 38 beDENIED as MOOT; and this case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 8/9/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
37
ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Plaintiff's motions to dismiss (19,31) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/20/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
July 21, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Plaintiffs claims against defendants Erdos and Cool, and all defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to §28 U.S.C. §§1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1).Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/21/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?