Taylor v. Postal Service (U.S.)
Plaintiff: Anthony J Taylor
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Case Number: 1:2017cv00106
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/27/17. Defendants 9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED. This case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and TERMINATED from the Courts docket. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendant's motion to dismiss 9 be GRANTED, that this case be dismissed with prejudice and closed. Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/12/2017. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The Clerk of Court shall re-file the original complaint form as a "First Amended Complaint" with all attachments submitted by Plaintiff on 2/23/2017 to be filed as Exhibits to the construed First Amended Complaint , excluding the tendered summons and U.S. Marshal forms; (2) The Clerk of Court shall transmit the referenced summons forms to the United States Marshal, who shall serve copies of the Amended Complaint, the summons, and this Order directing Plaintiff 's exhibits to be filed with the original complaint as an amended complaint. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States; (3) Plaintiff shall serve upon each Defendant or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon Defendant 's attorney(s), a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper to be filed with the clerk of court a certificate stating the date a true and correct co py of any document was mailed to Defendants or their counsel. Any paper received by a district judge or magistrate judge which has not been filed with the clerk or which fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court; (4) Plaintiff shall inform the Court promptly of any changes in Plaintiffs address which may occur during the pendency of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/20/2017. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that: (1) Together with a copy of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall send to Plaintiff an additional copy of the complaint form used for complaints fi led under 42 U.S.C. §2000e-5(f)(1); (2) As soon as practicable, but not later than 3/6/2017, Plaintiff shall file an amended statement of his claim that includes basic facts, along with a copy of any notice of his right to sue; (3) Plaint iff shall keep the Court apprised of his current address; (4) Plaintiff is advised that a failure to comply with a court order, including but not limited to this Order, will result in a recommendation that his complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim and/or for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/22/2017. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?