Cook v. Woodard et al
Plaintiff: |
Johnnie D. Cook |
Defendant: |
Ryan Woodard, William Cool and Roger Weaks |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00532 |
Filed: |
August 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Timothy S. Black |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephanie K. Bowman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 4, 2019 |
Filing
49
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 35 Defendant Ryan Woodard's Motion for Summary Judgment, 37 Defendant William Cool's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) Defendant Woodard's motion for summary judgment 35 shou ld be GRANTED, with all claims to be dismissed against that Defendant; (2) Defendant Cool's motion for summary judgment 37 should be GRANTED IN PART as to Plaintiff's limited claim that Defendant engaged in retaliatory conduct shortly bef ore or during the RIB hearing, but shall be DENIED concerning Plaintiff's claim that Defendant charged him with a conduct report in retaliation for his exercise of his First Amendment rights; (3) If this Report and Recommendation is adopted, th e presiding district judge should set this case for trial. Objections to R&R due by 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/4/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
March 1, 2018 |
Filing
27
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 15 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/1/18. (jlm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing
15
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 11/30/2017. Plaintiffs 6 Motion to Amend/Correct is hereby GRANTED. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. The complaint, as amended, be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1), with the exception of the following claims, which may proceed: Eighth Amendment claim of excessive force against defendant Ryan Woodard, as stated in the original complaint and plaintiffs retal iation claim against defendant Cool, as stated in the amended complaint 2. Defendants 11 moion to dismiss the amended complaint as to defendant Woodard be DENIED. IT IS ORDERED THAT: The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the original an d amended/corrected complaints (Doc. 3, 10), summons, the Order granting plaintiff in forma pauperis status, and this Order and Report and Recommendation upon defendants Woodard and Cool as directed by plaintiff, with costs of service to be advanced by the United States. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?