Secretary of Labor v. Macy's, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta and Secretary of Labor
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan and Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00541
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Referring Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/11/2019. (ss)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Pikofsky, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Sara Pikofsky) (Johnson, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Taggart, Carolyn)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Britt, Kent)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Secretary of Labor. (Wilemon, Kevin)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Secretary of Labor. (Wilemon, Kevin)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Secretary of Labor. (Wilemon, Kevin)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Britt, Kent)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Pikofsky, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Sara Pikofsky) (Johnson, Robert)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Taggart, Carolyn)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Cigna Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Connecticut General Life Insurance Company.. (Taggart, Carolyn)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Paul Johnson for Defendants Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan (Johnson, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Defendants Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan of Withdrawal of Counsel (Cogley, Lindsay)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This civil action is before the Court regarding the parties' joint motion for an extension of time (Doc. #32 ). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. #32 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiff's first amended complaint on or before 10/1/18. If appropriate, Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' responses on or before 10/31/18, and Defendants shall file any reply briefs on or before 11/21/18. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/17/18. (jlm)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants answer to first amended complaint due 10/01/18. (jlm)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/1/2018. by Defendant Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taggart, Carolyn)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for continued Settlement Conference held on 4/24/2018. Counsel for parties present. Defendants will notify the Court & the Dept. of Labor of the status of proceedings by 5/15/2018. (Court Reporter: None present) (art)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER setting follow-up Settlement Conference discussions set for Tuesday, 4/24/2018 at 09:00 AM in Chambers Room 716 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/9/2018. (art)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for a Settlement Conference held in chambers on 2/8/2018. Counsel and parties for plaintiff and defendants present. Matter not settled this date. Case set for continued settlement conference discussions before MJ Litkovitz on Tues., 4/24/2018 at 9:00 am in chambers Room 716. (Court Reporter: None present) (art)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Setting Mediation Conference: Follow-up Settlement Conference set for Thursday, 2/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in Chambers Room 716 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (art)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry: Case called this date before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for a Settlement Conference held in Chambers on 12/14/2017. Counsel and parties for plaintiff, and defendants present. Matter was not settled this date. However, negotiations are on-going. A follow-up Settlement Conference before MJ Litkovitz has been set for Thurs., 2/8/2018 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter: None present) (art)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. Morgan. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/7/17. (gs)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Secretary of Labor re #23 Notice of Appearance (Chapa, Ruben)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Defendant Connecticut General Life Insurance Company re #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6210742) of Amanda L. Morgan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of the State of California for Amanda L. Morgan) (Taggart, Carolyn)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE by Clerk re #23 Notice of Appearance by Ruben R. Chapa: document filed without a certificate of service as is required pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct the filing, use the Certificate of Service event found under Civil Events-Initial Pleadings and Service-Service of Process and link a one page certificate of service to doc. 23 when prompted. (eh)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruben R Chapa for Plaintiff Secretary of Labor (Chapa, Ruben)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Hamill. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/29/17. (gs)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Case referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz for settlement purposes only. (art)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Room 716 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (sct)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6210742) of Amanda L. Morgan by Defendant Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of the State of California for Amanda L. Morgan) (Taggart, Carolyn)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6210718) of John Hamill by Defendant Connecticut General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of the State of Illinois for John Hamill) (Taggart, Carolyn)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This civil action is before the Court regarding Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's first amended complaint. (Doc. 18). For good cause shown, that motion (Doc. 18) is GRANTED. Defendants must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's first amended complaint no later than 21 days after the parties' upcoming mediation before the Magistrate Judge, which has not yet been scheduled. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black. (sct)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/4/2018. by Defendants Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bouffard, Lindsay)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of E. Desmond Hogan, Briana L. Black, and Zachary W. Best. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/13/17. (sct)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sara Pikofsky. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/2/17. (gs)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-6187290) of E Desmond Hogan, Briana L Black, Zachary W Best by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Best - Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Black - Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Hogan - Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Britt, Kent)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement: This pleading was docketed without a certificate of service as required by S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct, file the certificate of service with civil event "Certificate of Service" located under Civil Events/Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process and link to entry #14 when prompted. (mr)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company.. (Britt, Kent)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan. (Bouffard, Lindsay)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Macy's, Inc.. (Bouffard, Lindsay)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6182846) of Sara Pikofsky by Defendant Macy's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Sara Pikofsky) (Bouffard, Lindsay)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan on 8/29/2017, answer due 10/30/2017. (Wilemon, Kevin)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Macy's, Inc. on 8/29/2017, answer due 10/30/2017. (Wilemon, Kevin)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company on 8/29/2017, answer due 10/30/2017. (Wilemon, Kevin)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Macy's, Inc. on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Wilemon, Kevin)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan on 8/17/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Wilemon, Kevin)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan answer due 10/16/2017. (jlw)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Connecticut General Life Insurance Company on 8/29/2017, answer due 10/30/2017. (Wilemon, Kevin)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Secretary of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilemon, Kevin)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Wilemon for Plaintiff Secretary of Labor (Wilemon, Kevin)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Macy's, Inc., Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan. (jlw)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, #3 Summons Form Macy's, Inc., #4 Summons Form Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, #5 Summons Form Connecticut General Life Insurance Company) (Wilemon, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secretary of Labor v. Macy's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary W. Best
Represented By: Briana L. Black
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Kent Allen Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Paul Johnson
Represented By: Sara Pikofsky
Represented By: Lindsay M Cogley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Robert Paul Johnson
Represented By: Sara Pikofsky
Represented By: Lindsay M Cogley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Taggart
Represented By: John J Hamill, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Kevin M. Wilemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor
Represented By: Kevin M. Wilemon
Represented By: Ruben R Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?