Shoulders v. Cherryholmes et al
Plaintiff: |
Emanuel Shoulders |
Defendant: |
Z. Cherryholmes, Gary Mohr, Tom Schwietzer and Rutherford |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00703 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
WARREN |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael R. Barrett |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephanie K. Bowman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 24 Report and Recommendation denying 10 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/21/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 31, 2018 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy thereof. Clerk's office shall update Plaintiff's address on docket and also send docs. 23 , 24 , 27 . Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/31/2018. (mr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 6 Report and Recommendation overruling Plaintiff's objections; the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice with the exception of plaintiff's Eight Amendment failure to protect claims against Cher ryholmes and Rutherford and his First Amendment and excessive force claims against Cherryholmes. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/14/18. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, the Order granting plaintiff in forma pauperis status, and this Order and Report and Recommendation upon defendants C herryholmes and Rutherford as directed by plaintiff, with costs of service to be advanced by the United States. 2. Plaintiff shall serve upon defendants or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon defendants attorney(s), a copy of every furth er pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. 3. Plaintiff shall inform the Court promptly of any changes in his address which may occur during the pendency of this lawsuit. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: The complaint be DISMISS ED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1), with the exception of plaintiffs Eighth Amendment failure to protect claims against defendants Cherryholmes and Rutherford, and his First Amendment and excessive forc e claims against Cherryholmes. ( Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2017) signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/12/2017. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?