Hargrove v. Frisby et al

Plaintiff: Daniel P Hargrove
Defendant: Frisby, Couch, Taylor, Whitlow and Palmer
Case Number: 1:2017cv00748
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: WARREN
Referring Judge: Stephanie K. Bowman
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS The Court does determine that 25 Report and Recommendation should be adopted. Accordingly, defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 18) is GRANTED. All other pending motions (Docs. 13, 14, 17, and 20) are DENIED as MOOT. This case is hereby TERMINATED from the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/17/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 12, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint 18 be GRANTED, and that all other motions 13 14 17 20 be DENIED AS MOOT. If the Court rejects the recommendation that the moti on to dismiss be granted, the undersigned ALTERNATIVELY RECOMMENDS that the Court grant Defendants' motion to vacate this Court's prior grant of Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, pending a new determination based up on Plaintiff's submission of a new application to so proceed. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/12/2018. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 8, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accordingly, plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28U.S.C. §§1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1) with the exception of plaintiffs Fourth Amendment individual capacit y claim against defendants Frisby and Couch and plaintiffs First Amendment individual capacity Free Exercise claim and, to the extent it seeks injunctive relief, plaintiffs Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act (RLUIPA) claim against defendants Chaplain Taylor and Chaplain Palmer. Plaintiffs motion to add a defendant (Doc. 7) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/8/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hargrove v. Frisby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?