Bullocks v. Mummert et al
Plaintiff: |
Gerald Bullocks |
Defendant: |
Aaron Mummert and Linnea Mahlman |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00023 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Cincinnati Office |
County: |
SCIOTO |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephanie K. Bowman |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan J. Dlott |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
7
ORDER ADOPTING 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice with the exception of plaintiff's first amendment retaliation claim against defendant Mummert. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/6/18. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
5
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiffs motion to amend/correct 2 is hereby GRANTED. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: The complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b)(1), with the exception of plaintiffs First Amendment retaliation claim against defendant Mummert. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, the Order granting plaintiff in forma pauperis status, and this Order and Report a nd Recommendation upon defendant Mummert as directed by plaintiff, with costs of service to be advanced by the United States. 2. Plaintiff shall serve upon defendant or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon defendants attorney, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. 3. Plaintiff shall inform the Court promptly of any changes in his address which may occur during the pendency of this lawsuit ( Objections to R&R due by 2/20/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 02/06/2018. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?