Thompson v. Ohio Dept. of Rehab. & Corr. et al

Plaintiff: Gerald Thompson
Defendant: Ohio Dept. of Rehab. & Corr. et al
Case Number: 1:2018cv00024
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: SCIOTO
Presiding Judge: Susan J. Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L. Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff/appellant is not entitled to proceed on appeal without paying the filing fee. It is therefore Recommended that plaintiff/appellant be assessed the appellate filing fee and be given (30) days within which to pay it. Objections to R&R due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/13/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 3, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court does determine that 8 Report and Recommendation should be adopted. Accordingly, this case is DIMISSED for plaintiffs failure to pay the full filing fee as ordered by the Court. Plaintiff is assessed the full filing fee of $400.00. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/3/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 12, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 1) is DENIED. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the full $400 fee ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) required to com mence this action within thirty (30) days, and that plaintiff is to be notified that his failure to pay the full $400 fee within 30 days will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/12/2018. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Ohio Dept. of Rehab. & Corr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Dept. of Rehab. & Corr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?