Cook v. Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Plaintiff: Erica Cook
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Case Number: 1:2018cv00083
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to a 45-day conditional dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/23/19. (ba)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Joint MOTION to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference and to Set Trial Date filed by Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland; Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/24/19. (ba)
June 21, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference and to Set Trial Date by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Dow, Dustin)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 6/17/19. (ba)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Surreply within 7 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/28/19. (ba)
May 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Settlement Conference held on 5/13/2019; Brian Butler appeared with Daniel Tradaway and Erica Cook; John Lewis appeared with Christine Weiss for Defendant; matter at impasse; case to continue as scheduled. (ba)
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
March 15, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Lewis, John)
March 14, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Facebook Records Produced in Discovery) (Butler, Brian)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that the Settlement Conference set for 3/13/19 is RESET to 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM and remains set in Chambers, Room 239, before Judge Michael R. Barrett; parties shall provide the Court with a limited 5-page exparte position statement which shall be emailed to the Court at barrett_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov no later than 4/26/19. The Court will conduct exparte conferences prior to the scheduled settlement conference. Unless prior arrangements have been discussed with the Court, party representatives with complete settlement authority must be present throughout the conference. (ba) Modified on 3/4/2019 (ba) to edit the reset date and to generate a NEF.
February 28, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Lewis, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 26 DEPOSITION of Janet Reed-James taken on 12/06/2018 by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 25 DEPOSITION of James Duncanson taken on 11/09/2018 by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7) (Butler, Brian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION of James Duncanson and Janet Reed-James by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Responses due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/8/19. (ba)
February 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment New date requested 2/14/2019. by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Strike; the Clerk is directed to strike 16 . Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/30/19. (ba)
January 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing Transcript of and Exhibits to Deposition of Michael Leber (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Michael Leber, #2 Exhibit Leber Deposition Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit Leber Deposition Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit Leber Deposition Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit Leber Deposition Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit Leber Deposition Exhibit Y) (Lewis, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing Transcript of and Exhibits to Deposition of Deborah Keener (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deborah Keener Deposition Transcript Pages 1-60, #2 Exhibit Deborah Keener Deposition Transcript Pages 61-121, #3 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 10 - Leber, #4 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 3 - Duncanson, #13 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 8 - Leber, #14 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit 9 - Leber, #15 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit R, #17 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit T, #18 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit U, #19 Exhibit Keener Deposition Exhibit V) (Lewis, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #17 MOTION to Strike 16 Notice (Other),, and Amend CM/ECF 16 of Filing Amended Transcript of and Exhibits to Deposition of Erica Cook (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cook Deposition Transcript Pages 1-56, #2 Exhibit Cook Deposition Transcript Pages 57-112, #3 Exhibit Cook Deposition Transcript Pages 113-168, #4 Exhibit Cook Deposition Transcript Pages 169-210, #5 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit BB, #32 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit CC, #33 Exhibit Cook Deposition Exhibit DD) (Lewis, John)
January 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike 16 Notice (Other),, and Amend CM/ECF 16 by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Lewis, John). Added MOTION to Amend/Correct on 1/23/2019 (eh).
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Pertinent Pages from the November 7, 2018 Deposition of Erica Cook, #3 Exhibit 2 - Exhibits from the November 7, 2018 Deposition of Erica Cook, #4 Exhibit 3 - Pertinent Pages from the November 9, 2018 Deposition of Michael Leber, #5 Exhibit 4 - Pertinent Pages from the November 9, 2018 Deposition of Deborah Keener, #6 Exhibit 5 - Exhibits from the Nobemver 9, 2018 Deposition of Deborah Keener, #7 Exhibit 6 - FRBC-Cook II 000299, #8 Exhibit 7 - FRBC-Cook I 000038, #9 Exhibit 8 - FRBC-Cook I 000026, #10 Exhibit 9 - FRBC-Cook II 000121, #11 Exhibit 10 - ECook000001-000003, #12 Exhibit 11 - ECook000121, #13 Exhibit 12 - ECook000903, #14 Exhibit 13 - ECook000902, #15 Exhibit 14 - ECook000112, #16 Exhibit 15 - ECook000153, #17 Exhibit 16 - ECook000118, #18 Exhibit 17 - ECook000171, #19 Exhibit 18 - ECook000789, #20 Exhibit 19 - ECook000825, #21 Exhibit 20 - ECook000748) (Lewis, John)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/17/19 granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions; Dispositive Motion deadline extended to 1/22/19. (ba)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 1/22/2019. by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (dDow, Dustin)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/11/18. (ba)
July 10, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Entry Of) by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Stipulated Protective Order) (Lewis, John)
June 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 6/26/2018; Brian Butler appeared for Plaintiff; Dustin Dow and John Lewis appeared for Defendant; parties will attempt to work on an agreement for a proposed protective order related to the filing of dispositive motions; case to proceed as scheduled. (ba)
June 18, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that a Status Conference is set for 6/26/2018 at 01:00 PM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 4/24/18 for conferencing instructions (ba)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint is dismiss; all other counts remain pending. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/14/18. (ba)
May 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 5/7/2018: Brian Butler appeared for Plaintiff; John Lewis and Dustin Dow appeared for Defendant; case to proceed as scheduled. (mr)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CALENDAR ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2018. Motions directed to pleadings due by 11/16/2018. Lay Witness due by 9/13/2018. Status Conference set for 5/7/2018 at 01:30 PM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 9/13/2018. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 11/12/2018. Defendant Primary Expert due by 10/12/2018. Discovery due by 12/17/2018. Motions due by 1/21/2019. Settlement Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Jury trial 8/2019. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/24/18. (ba)
April 16, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
March 30, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
March 14, 2018 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/13/2018. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
March 9, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Lewis, John)
March 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Lewis, John)
February 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz assigned for referral pursposes. (ba)
February 6, 2018 Filing 5 DECISION AND ENTRY SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, WESTERN DIVISION AT CINCINNATI; TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 2/6/18. (pb)
February 6, 2018 Case transferred in from Dayton Division on 02/06/2018, Case Number 3:18-cv-9. Case assigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kma)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER sustaining #4 Motion to Change Venue to Southern District of Ohio, Western Division at Cincinnati. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 02/05/2018. (tp)
January 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff Erica Cook. (Butler, Brian)
January 23, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland on 1/9/2018, answer due 3/12/2018. (Butler, Brian)
January 10, 2018 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 01/10/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-14. Case assigned to Judge Walter H. Rice.. (jlw)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, this case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Dayton. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/10/2018. (jlw)
January 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6270213), filed by Erica Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Butler, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Represented By: Dustin M. Dow
Represented By: John B Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Cook
Represented By: Marc David Mezibov
Represented By: Brian Joseph Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?