Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc. v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: CARDINAL LAND CONSERVANCY, INC.
Defendant: State Conservationis Terry J. Cosby, Steven C. Silverman, Ohio Department of Agriculture, NATIONAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE, Secretary SONNY PERDUE, NATIONAL APPEALS DIVISION, United States Department of Agriculture, Commodity Credit Corporation, Director David T. Daniels, Acting Chief Leonard Jordan, Director, United States Department of Agriculture, Director, National Appeals Division, State Conservationist, Natural Resources Conservation Service, Acting Chief, United States Department of Agriculture, Secretary, United States Department of Agriculture, Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture and Acting Chief, Natural Resources Conservation Service
Case Number: 1:2018cv00534
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Cincinnati Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint,, filed by Ohio Department of Agriculture. (Patterson, James)
September 25, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint,, filed by Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture. (Patterson, James)
September 11, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Approval Letter from NRCS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cooperative Agreement and Amendments, #3 Exhibit 3 - NRCS's Ineligibility Determination, #4 Exhibit 4 - Administrative Judge's Appeal Determination, #5 Exhibit 5 - NRCS's Request for Review, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cardinal's Response to NRCS's Request for Review, #7 Exhibit 7 - Ltr. from NRCS State Conservationist Denying Extension, #8 Exhibit 8 - NAD Director Review Determination) (Morales, Jennifer)
August 24, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Director, United States Department of Agriculture answer due 8/28/2018. (bjc)
August 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: National Appeals Division answer due 8/29/2018; National Resources Conservation Service answer due 8/29/2018. (bjc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture. (Patterson, James)
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Ohio Department of Agriculture. (Patterson, James)
August 24, 2018 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] Set/Reset Deadlines: National Appeals Division answer due 9/4/2018; National Resources Conservation Service answer due 9/4/2018. (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 8/24/2018 (bjc).
August 24, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant National Appeals Division. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 23, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture. Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 23, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Ohio Department of Agriculture. Ohio Department of Agriculture served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commodity Credit Corporation. Commodity Credit Corporation served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant National Appeals Division. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant National Resources Conservation Service. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED AGREED ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/17/2018. (mr)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Agreed Order by Plaintiff Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc.. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Patterson for Defendant Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture (Patterson, James)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robert Patterson for Defendant Ohio Department of Agriculture (Patterson, James)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Svirnovskiy for Plaintiff Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc. (Svirnovskiy, Simon)
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J Morales for Plaintiff Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc. (Morales, Jennifer)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A Castro for Defendants Acting Chief, United States Department of Agriculture, Director, United States Department of Agriculture, National Appeals Division, National Resources Conservation Service, Secretary, United States Department of Agriculture, State Conservationist, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture (Castro, Margaret)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Morales, Jennifer). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/2/2018 (sct).
August 2, 2018 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,,,, NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED EXHIBIT 5 TO COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 5 to Complaint) (Morales, Jennifer)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Chief, United States Department of Agriculture, Commodity Credit Corporation, Director, United States Department of Agriculture, National Appeals Division, National Resources Conservation Service, Secretary, United States Department of Agriculture, State Conservationist, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form) (sct)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture, Ohio Department of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sct)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARDINAL LAND CONSERVANCY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6542755), filed by CARDINAL LAND CONSERVANCY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Approval Letter from NRCS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Coop Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cardinal's 1st Req for Extension, #4 Exhibit 4 - Memo from Cosby, #5 Exhibit 5 - NRCS's Ineligibility Determination, #6 Exhibit 6 - Adm Judge's Appeal Determination, #7 Exhibit 7 - NRCS Req for Review, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cardinal's Response, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Cosby Approving Second Ext, #10 Exhibit 10 - Letter from Cosby Denying Third Ext, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons Form AG's Summons, #13 Summons Form US Attorney Summons, #14 Summons Form Commodity Credit Corp Summons, #15 Summons Form David T. Daniels Summons, #16 Summons Form Leonard Jordan Summons, #17 Summons Form National Appeals Division Summons, #18 Summons Form National Resources Summons, #19 Summons Form Ohio Dept. of Agriculture Summons, #20 Summons Form Sonny Perdue Summons, #21 Summons Form Steven Silverman Summons, #22 Summons Form Terry Cosby Summons, #23 Summons Form USDA Summons) (Morales, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal Land Conservancy, Inc. v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Conservationis Terry J. Cosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Department of Agriculture
Represented By: James Robert Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RESOURCES CONSERVATION SERVICE
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary SONNY PERDUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL APPEALS DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodity Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director David T. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Chief Leonard Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, National Appeals Division
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Conservationist, Natural Resources Conservation Service
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Chief, United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Ohio Department of Agriculture
Represented By: James Robert Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Chief, Natural Resources Conservation Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARDINAL LAND CONSERVANCY, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer J Morales
Represented By: Simon Svirnovskiy
Represented By: Christopher S Habel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?