Aaron et al v. AETNA et al
Plaintiff: Roger Johnson, Richard Elliott, Adrian Lilly, Tracy Esselman, Chelsea Johnson, Alisa Wilson, Patrick Callagan, David Harris, Leona Beyer, Wayne Hatfield, Haley Warren, Doug Callahan, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Deborah Doyle, Sherry Spangenberg, Mary Zureick, Randy Brewer, Dorothy Rose, Lyndon Langford, Jeff Potts, Theresa Helton, Carla Griessman, Shannon Koehler, Edward Thiessen, Dominque Bray, Michael Brophy, JoAnn Young, Candi McKinney, Laura Batsche, Joi Crowe, Brandon Mathis, Patricia Legendre, Jimmy Allen, Edythe Bishop, Michele Keplinger, Brandon Lacinak, Kevin Haggard, Donald Mauntel, Damon Deck, Caela Finnell, Maggie Knauer, Kelly Williams, Danielle Reed, Lonnie Wheeler, Jeremy Brewer, Robert Moore, Haley Payne, Ruthie Sears, Judith Gardner, Rose Koehler, Lynne List, Vicki Buschur, Patricia Shott, Elaine Waxler, Donald Smith, Christopher McCaughey, Kevin Hartness, Carol Pummell, Janet Cornett, Kirstin Weisman, Debbie Moore, Ricky Hounchell, Barbara McClure, Steven Bayliss, Lindsey Bray, Ashley Casey, Nancy Begley, Traci Mathews, Tracy Janson, Karen Crissinger, Angelina Foster, Hiram McCauley, Dorothea Hamilton, Damian Fields, Patrick Willoughby, Anthony Bode, Joann Frazier, Sherri Lynn Allen, Brittany Theilman, Cheryl Wyatt, Delores Scott, Karen Miller, Lennie Fossett, Julie Martin, Troy Wilder, Ashley Walker, Antoinette Benjamin, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Amber Johnson, Jean Fenner, Glenna Shafer, Brenda Conley, Jennifer Myers, Sharon Howard, Holly Reifenberger, Jennifer Hickey, Marcella McDonald, Kimberly Mayer, Daniel Webber, Diane Meyer, Darrell Earls, Carolyn Dotson, Jonathan Brunner, Timothy Hannon, Carrie Crowe, Debra Henderson, Lindsey Walsh, Mackenzie Bender, Karen Taylor, Martha Kibler, Rahmann Nisbett, Greg Graber, Heather Pickett, William Moore, Timothy Marshall, Gail Nordeman, Victoria Landrum, Eddie Stallings, Elsa Ieraci, Ailene Levan, Maurice Grabow, Charlann Shepherd, Billy Wolsing, Gary Neu, Robert Runtz, Sarah Jessee, Derek List, Stefanie Deaton, Ben Thaeler, Erin Greelish, Ronald Schuster, Crystal Garrison, Jack Marcheschi, Angela Buechel, Billy Dugger, Forrest Crowe, Caidan Bailey, Joseph Schimmel, William Dabney, Connie Underwood, Mona Eder, Dawn Leeann Brown, Bryan Powers, Sara Jonas, Kenneth Conger, Kerry McNeal, Melvin James, Tonia McQueary, Ollie Deaton, Douglas Drafts, Katelyn Kauffman, Francene Cook, Cathy Holley, Frieda Aaron, Chris Ebbing, Jennifer Bookman, Denise Bess, Kaitlyn Boggs, Timothy Osborn, Vicky Wilson, Robert Masters, Jason Riley, Kathryn Howell, Kimberly Bates, Michelle Agee, Sandra Couch, Orris Smoote, Nick Benge, Tammy Jones, Ryan Handorf, Terry Beil, Gary Coots, Jacob Feltner, Richard Lozier, Emanuel Wyatt, Patrick Stephenson, Duane Pelfrey, Teresa Worley, Troy Beckelheimer, Robin Schiller, Sara Selm, Tom Meyers, Paula Wilson, Mark Reed, Brooke Vandervort, Derrill Reynolds, Brenda Errgang, Taura Halbert, Jacob Durham, Kathleen Bushelman, Staci Smith, Mary Gerbus, Kevin McDonald, Darlene Sterling, Barbara Couch, Brian Atkins, Lenora Haggard, Kameron McNeal, Tempie Stephenson, Valarie Kopp, Katherine Walls, Marjorie Newman, Dana Conley, Denise Hamilton, Donald Moore, Mike Sand, Deborah Worley, Rebekah Brady, Christine Geralds, Shamiya Ford, Jeffrey Poff, Rhonda Mains, Michael Crail, Asia Shannon, Judy Young, David Hall, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Helen Ward, Karen Sisson, David Snider, Robert Densler, Elizabeth Compo, Ronald Rowley, Jetton Wilson, Reba Morgan, Sierra Stratman, Jody Bauer, Priscilla Wittmeyer, Kimberly Jenkins, Sara Hauenstein, Junior Monroe, Josh Fogel, Nellie Davis, William Wolder, Karen Johnson, Jacqueline Judkins, Earl Thomas Stamps, Jr., Troy Fite, Veronica Yeakle, Amanda Koch, Crystal Pierce, Evelyn Helton, Penny Brackett, Trey Billing, Stacy John Martin, Debbie Rodriguez, Hannah Zymslo, Luke Holcomb, Jeffrey Hyde, Josh Roy, Melissa Habermehl, Vera Moffitt, Tom Lantry, Patricia Adams, Thomas Atkinson, Phyllis Bechtold, Andrew Carr, Tonya Chisman, Stephen Carmen, Jessica Hastings, Shawnda Benton, Richard Brorein, David Rohling, Robert Mounce, Teresa McMillen, Melissa Braucher, Paul Scholz, Alyssa Flatt, Arlene Fait, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Kathleen Teslcher, Patrick Schmit, Sandra Lemmel, Kristine Dority, Ryan Hensley, Laura Aker, Robert Houghton, Jr., Dawn Wingert, Dirk Hitchcock, Keith Young, Loretta Hon, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Sandra Roundtree, Kenny Wilson, Courtney Hammons, Joy Cullins, Deon Stigall, Jr., Kathy Hersley, Karen Higginbothan, Vivian Kiefer, Terry Wilson, Lyndsey Middendorf, Robert Campbell, Chelsea Hortman, Patrick Dugan, Lisa Conley, Corrine Zachry, Jordan Vance, Sharon Brice, Antoine Powell, Joseph Davis, Alissa Hightchew, Carol Ross, Andrew Schultz, Heather Slayback, Benjamin Williams, Violet Whalen, Maurine Langford, Stephanie Mueller, Angela Pennington, Mark McMurren, Michelle Noble, Kim Underwood, James Pumpelly, Christina Brashear, Grant McKenney, Jeff Peddicord, Carla Wooten, Adam Hartman, Sandra Dennis, Cathy Beil, David Conger, Clarence Phillips, Donna Good, Francine Ford, Natasha Lainhart, Irene Hyde, Eric Courtney, Nancy Bowman, Jenna McCall, David Fisher, Jordan Ribariu, Kevin Schmit, Amanda Franks, Dana Setters, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Samantha Hamilton, Katrina Allen, Stacy Fletcher, George Arnold, Rhonda Scott, David Huser, Dillon Jones, Paul Boggs, Tara Brown, Nicholas Battista, David Shempert, Tammy Dale, Bunnavuth Chhun, Michael Cotter, Arletta Bowling, Nicole Baker, Brandon Schoborg, Heather McCann, Dawn Merland, Alyssa Hall, Gerald Botner, Douglas Hayes, Sr., Joshua Ault, Janet Campbell, Hillary Levandofsky, Bert Stidham, Thomas Barth, Amber Work, Jason Romer, Alyssa Jackson, Kayla Burton, Stephanie Hawks, Diana Ashcraft, Minuet Healy, Paul Baker, Samantha Redrow, Deena Borchers, Sydney Jones, John Collins, Kevin Elfers, Cindy Bartlett, Gerald Hammons, Tyler McKnight, Kevin Hunley, Joetta Nafe, Laura Weisbecker, Jessica Cochran, Margie Eversole, Michelle Byar, Harry Reynolds, Kathryn Curley, Robert Wilson, Ryan Miller, Dawn Dunklin, Tammy Hughes, Ali Scully, Denise Helton, Richard Stanfield, Kyra McClendon, Michelle Beavan, Christopher Haynes, Christina Rutter, Christopher Atwood, Tim Moore, Charles Nelson, David Smith, Erma Jean Gilbert, James Cuzzort, Rachel Jones, Paul Wilson, James Albers, Larry Krech, Cory Wright, Todd Ray, Shirley Mains, Dannie Owens, Gordon Rister, Deborah Sturdivant, Brandon Webster, Michael Watkins, Adrienne Thomas, Celeste Hoffman, Billie Jane Moore, Brad Arnold, Katherine Prater, Larry Stephen Hayes, Timothy Byrd, Tammie Little, Wendy Oberlander, Jenny Grimm, Evelyn Young, Tonya Neal, Thomas Augst, Gayle Bachmann, Judy Beck, James McCain, Karen Leger, Joseph Wilder, Jack Buskirk, Karen Feltner, Denise Benge, Michael Hillard, Joe Rutter, Michelle Walters, Beth Leisring, Alex Taylor, Valerie Reeves, John Richardson, Cathleen Weber, Kelly Martin, Kim Schmit, Martha Hutton, Sherry Kidd, Margaret Radenheimer, Vicki Wallace, Brian Thien, Zachary Stacy, Brenda Shell, Stephanie Jobe, Tracey Walsh, Latoya Bradshaw, Deborah Roark, Amanda Ayres, Nancy Pfetsch, Tammy Mann, Kent Reynolds, Susan Griffin, Michael Cook, Kelly Hennessy, Sophia White, Chris Clark, Scott Daniel, Heather Schuster, Lynn Haley, Christine Goldstein, Mary Ravenscraft, Ryan Tackett, Linda Favaron, Timothy Schulze, Marsha Martin, Stephanie Moore, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Angela Ferrell, James Brown, Jonathan Atwell, Michael Sander, Vicky Mains, Shannon Wallace, Kimberly Luse, Misty Emerson, Michelle Sizemore, Tamala Lovette, Julie Freeman, Leslie Powers, Deborah Kidd, Lisa Reynolds, Brittany Brewer, Ron Wright, Patricia Boone, Barbara Hensley, Samantha Mink, Tiffany Meadows, Brenda Butler, Carolyn Hersong, William Benton, Jeff Remley, Ralph Dawson, George Hutchinson, Joseph Baumgardner, Timothy Whalen, Jennifer Ballinger, Sandra Radeke, Susan Schock, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Ruhama Hall, Joan Jones, Carol Wilson, Robbie Gregory, Teresa Nichols, Mike Koelblin, Melissa Cotter, Jacklen Upchurch, Robert Houghton, Sr., Sarra Mueller, Charlotte King, Kelly Engle, Josh Kauffman, Michael Odulana, Doris Botner, Amy Fuller, Ryan Tanner, Todd Green, Regina Wesley, Tom Pritchard, Terry Collins, Derek Mayfield, Katie Lehmkuhl, Randall Metcalf, Chris Scheper, Rebecca Applegate, Kelly Robinson, Gloria Greene, Donna Smallwood, Rita Hounchell, Shandon Simmons, Earl Stamps, Jr., Clara Tubbs-Hills, Josh Ault, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Gary L Coots, Carolyn Hursong and Sherri Allen
Defendant: Marguette National Life Insurance Company, Medicaid Coventry Care Coventry Health Care, Blue Cross Blue Shield, Golden Rule Insurance (United Healthcare), AETNA Kentucky, Benovation CAI Insurance Company, Medicaid Buckeye, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Golden Rule Ins. Co.), GEHA, Passport Health Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield Florida, Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc., Medicaid Caresource, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., BCBS Illinois Health Care Service Corporation, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Sheild New Jersey, Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC, BCBS Minnesota BCBSM Inc, Medicaid Kenpac, Centene, BCBS North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia, MEDBEN, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield Comunity Insurance Company, BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc., Custom Design Benefits QI Services, Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association, Anthem BCBS Virginia Anthem, Inc., Kentucky Medicaid, KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Tennessee, Inc., Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company, Cigna Healthcare, Inc., BCBS Kentucky Anthem Insurance Co., Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., BCBS Massachusetts, Amerigroup Corp., Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company, Veterans Administration, BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation, AETNA, Healthspan / Healthspan Preferred, Health Alliance, Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc. and Aflac
Case Number: 1:2018cv00631
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
2 Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2020 Filing 319 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #313 Notice (Other), #311 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Due to Misjoinder of Plaintiffs and Misjoinder of Defendants), #312 MOTION for Joinder REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO MISJOINDER OF PLAINTIFFS AND MISJOINDER OF DEFENDANTS [DOC. NO. 311] New date requested 7/16/2020. by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Jodi Behrendt, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Joel Blair, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Glen Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Emma Burlile, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Doug Callahan, Patrick Calligan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Christina Canfield, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Sherri Cinquina-Listermann, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Michael Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Jacob Cotter, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Kali Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, Henry Curry, Samantha Curtis-Hamilton, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Dana Edwards, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Patsy Ervin, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Mark Funk, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Larry Stephen Hayes, Douglas Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Emily Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Damion Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Kelly Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Joshua Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman-Houston, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Nicholas Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Thomas Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Moore, Debra Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Harold J Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Hobert Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Desiree Peyton, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Steven Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Alexandra Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Shirley Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Nodra West, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Debra Wheeler, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Martha White-Hutton, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Jared Wolfe, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 318 NOTICE by Defendant Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney Jefferson C.M. Kisor (Kisor, Jefferson)
May 12, 2020 Filing 317 NOTICE by Defendant Sheakley Unicomp, Inc. re #311 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Due to Misjoinder of Plaintiffs and Misjoinder of Defendants) (Collier, Katherine)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Agreed Order dismissing Sheakley Unicomp, Inc. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/12/2020. (kaf)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Agreed Order dismissing O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/12/2020. (kaf)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #309 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Act as Trial Counsel. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/08/2020. (kaf)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Notation Order: #310 Motion to Dismiss stricken due to being duplicative. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/08/2020. (kaf)
May 8, 2020 Filing 313 NOTICE of Joinder and Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law by Defendant Russell & Oliver, PLLC. (Shaw, Mark) Modified Filing Party and Docket Text at the Request of the Filer on 5/8/2020 (bjc).
May 7, 2020 Filing 312 MOTION for Joinder REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO MISJOINDER OF PLAINTIFFS AND MISJOINDER OF DEFENDANTS [DOC. NO. 311] by Defendant Duke Energy Corporation. (Meeks, Conor)
May 7, 2020 Filing 311 MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Due to Misjoinder of Plaintiffs and Misjoinder of Defendants) by Defendants AETNA, AETNA Kentucky, Allied Benefits Systems, Inc., Amerigroup Corp., Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Atlas Roofing Corp., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Caresource, Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Health & Welfare Fund, Cigna Health Corporation, Cigna Healthcare, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Continental Life, Golden Rule Insurance Company, Healthsmart - Cincinnati, Healthspan, Inc., Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association, Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association Inc. (KIGA), MHBH - The Mail Handler's Benefit Plan, Medical Mutual of Ohio, Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc., NGS American, O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson, Rawling and Associates, PLLC, Sheakley Unicomp, Inc., The Phia Group, LLC, The Rawlings Company, LLC, UMR, Inc., USF Holland, LLC, United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc.. (Maley, John)
May 7, 2020 Filing 310 *STRICKEN PER 05/08/2020 NOTATION ORDER* MOTION to Dismiss Due to Misjoinder of Plaintiffs and Misjoinder of Defendants by Defendants AETNA, AETNA Kentucky, Allied Benefits Systems, Inc., Amerigroup Corp., Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Atlas Roofing Corp., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Caresource, Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Health & Welfare Fund, Cigna Health Corporation, Cigna Healthcare, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Continental Life, Custom Design Benefits QI Services, Golden Rule Insurance Company, Healthsmart - Cincinnati, Healthspan, Inc., Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association, Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association Inc. (KIGA), MHBH - The Mail Handler's Benefit Plan, Medical Mutual of Ohio, Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc., NGS American, O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson, Rawling and Associates, PLLC, Sheakley Unicomp, Inc., The Phia Group, LLC, The Rawlings Company, LLC, UMR, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc.. (Maley, John) Modified on 5/13/2020 (kaf).
May 7, 2020 Filing 309 MOTION for Order to Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Act as Trial Counsel by Defendant Healthspan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Barrera, Federico)
May 7, 2020 Filing 308 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Federico Gomez Barrera, III substituting for Susan H. Jackson as to Defendant Healthspan, Inc.. (Barrera, Federico)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Agreed Order dismissing AFLAC. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/07/2020. (kaf)
May 7, 2020 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to AFLAC by Defendant Aflac. (Maley, John)
May 6, 2020 Filing 305 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant MHBH - The Mail Handler's Benefit Plan. (Sheridan, Matthew)
May 6, 2020 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Sheridan for Defendant MHBH - The Mail Handler's Benefit Plan (Sheridan, Matthew)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Agreed Order dismissing Medical Benefits Administrators, Inc. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/01/2020. (kaf)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Agreed Order dismissing Benovation CAI Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/23/2020. (kaf)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Agreed Order dismissing Conduent Business Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/23/2020. (kaf)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Agreed Order dismissing Government Employees Health Association, Inc. (GEHA). Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/22/2020. (kaf)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 AGREED ORDER dismissing Corvel Corporation. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 04/22/2020. (kaf)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 AGREED ORDER dismissing Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 03/27/2020. (kaf)
March 9, 2020 Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T Giles for Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association (Giles, Brian)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 AGREED ORDER dismissing Health Alliance Midwest, Inc. and The Carl Foundation. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 03/04/2020. (kaf)
February 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew W. McFarland: Status Conference held on 02/27/2020. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants present by phone. Within 70 days of this Order, Defendants must file their consolidated motion regarding misjoinder of parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. Within 60 days of the filing of Defendants' motion, Plaintiffs must file their response in opposition. Within 60 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' response, Defendants must file their reply. The parties' memoranda may not exceed 25 pages without prior leave of Court. All other deadlines to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint and all deadlines related to Defendant The Phia Group's Motion to Dismiss #185 are hereby stayed. (kaf)
February 26, 2020 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Jefferson C.M. Kisor for Defendant Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc. (Kisor, Jefferson)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #293 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Herink as CO-COUNSEL is this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 2/25/2020. (ss)
February 24, 2020 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Dowie for Defendant The Phia Group, LLC (Dowie, Catherine)
February 24, 2020 Filing 293 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7348932) of Andrew J. Herink by Defendant Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Health & Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Seifried, Kent)
February 24, 2020 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L. Woody for Defendant The Phia Group, LLC (Woody, Ryan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 291 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Kevin L Murch substituting for Mark C. Melko as to Defendant Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc.. (Murch, Kevin)
February 13, 2020 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eugene Burke for Defendant Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company (Burke, James)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #288 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Jubinsky; granting #289 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles Gearing as CO-COUNSEL is this matter ONLY. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 2/7/2020. (ss)
February 6, 2020 Filing 289 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7321810) of Charles M. Gearing by Defendant NGS American. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Huffer, Steven)
February 6, 2020 Filing 288 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7321773) of Andrew G. Jubinsky by Defendant NGS American. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Huffer, Steven)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #287 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of W. Brad Nes as CO-COUNSEL is this matter ONLY. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 2/5/2020. (ss)
February 4, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7315931) of W. Brad Nes by Defendant USF Holland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Barber, Andrew)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER TERMINATING REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 01/29/2020. (kf)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #224 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Woody; granting #225 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Catherine Dowie as CO-COUNSEL is this matter ONLY. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 1/28/2020. (ss)
January 28, 2020 Filing 285 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Conduent Business Services, LLC, Conduent Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Conduent Incorporated for Conduent Business Services, LLC.. (Kent, Robert)
January 27, 2020 Filing 284 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama. (Bennett, Rebecca)
January 27, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J Bennett for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama (Bennett, Rebecca)
January 27, 2020 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Lawrence for Defendants Aetna Better Health of Kentucky, Aetna Better Health of Kentucky Insurance Company, Aetna Better Health of Ohio, Inc., Aetna Better Health, Inc., Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Continental Life (Lawrence, John)
January 23, 2020 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jerome Fogarty for Defendants Aetna Better Health of Kentucky, Aetna Better Health of Kentucky Insurance Company, Aetna Better Health of Ohio, Inc., Aetna Better Health, Inc., Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Continental Life (Fogarty, Robert)
January 23, 2020 Filing 280 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants National Government Services, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for National Government Services, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 279 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Community Insurance Company, Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Community Insurance Company.. (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 278 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 277 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 276 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 275 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 274 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant NGS American. (Huffer, Steven)
January 23, 2020 Filing 273 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield.. (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 272 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Amerigroup of Ohio, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Amerigroup of Ohio, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 271 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc... (Britt, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Amerigroup of Ohio, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 23, 2020 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Sheridan for Defendants Aetna Better Health of Kentucky, Aetna Better Health of Kentucky Insurance Company, Aetna Better Health of Ohio, Inc., Aetna Better Health, Inc., Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Continental Life (Sheridan, Matthew)
January 22, 2020 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant National Government Services, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Healthplus HP, LLC (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Community Insurance Company (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield (Abrams, Wesley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Britt Abrams for Defendant Amerigroup of Ohio, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley) Modified docket text on 1/23/2020 (eh).
January 22, 2020 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Britt for Defendant Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley) Modified docket text on 1/23/2020 (eh).
January 22, 2020 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant National Government Services, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Healthplus HP, LLC (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Community Insurance Company (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Amerigroup of Ohio, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 22, 2020 Filing 247 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Corvel Corporation. (Ferguson, Jennie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 246 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Duke Energy Corporation. (Meeks, Conor)
January 22, 2020 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald D. Holman, II for Defendant Duke Energy Corporation (Holman, Ronald)
January 22, 2020 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by Conor Hentze Meeks for Defendant Duke Energy Corporation (Meeks, Conor)
January 22, 2020 Filing 243 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association Inc. (KIGA). (Starts, Carrie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 242 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Benovation CAI Insurance Company. (Starts, Carrie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 241 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Allied Benefits Systems, Inc.. (Starts, Carrie)
January 22, 2020 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie K Ferguson for Defendant Corvel Corporation (Ferguson, Jennie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 239 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants USF Holland, LLC, YRC Worldwide Inc. identifying Corporate Parent YRC Worldwide Inc. for USF Holland, LLC.. (Barber, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Barber for Defendant USF Holland, LLC (Barber, Andrew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett P. Allen for Defendant O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson (Allen, Bennett)
January 21, 2020 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Cook for Defendant O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson (Cook, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Defendant Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Health & Welfare Fund. (Seifried, Kent) Modified Docket Text and Terminated Motion on 1/22/2020 (bjc).
January 21, 2020 Filing 234 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Molina Healthcare, Inc. for Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc... (Melko, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C Melko for Defendant Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc. (Melko, Mark)
January 21, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Kent for Defendant Conduent Business Services, LLC (Kent, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 231 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medical Benefits Administrators, Inc.. (Holaday, Rodney)
January 21, 2020 Filing 230 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Carl Foundation. (Holaday, Rodney)
January 21, 2020 Filing 229 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Health Alliance Midwest, Inc.. (Holaday, Rodney)
January 21, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven K Huffer for Defendant NGS American (Huffer, Steven)
January 17, 2020 Filing 227 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sheakley Unicomp, Inc.. (Frooman, James)
January 17, 2020 Filing 226 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Plaintiff Frieda Aaron, Defendant O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson. O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (cb)
January 15, 2020 Filing 225 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7282571) of Catherine Dowie by Defendant The Phia Group, LLC. (Beck, Jonathon)
January 15, 2020 Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7282551) of Ryan L. Woody by Defendant The Phia Group, LLC. (Beck, Jonathon)
January 14, 2020 Filing 223 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medical Mutual of Ohio. (Smith, Michael)
January 14, 2020 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by James C Frooman for Defendant Sheakley Unicomp, Inc. (Frooman, James)
January 14, 2020 Filing 221 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rawling and Associates, PLLC. (Terrell, Alyson)
January 14, 2020 Filing 220 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Rawlings Company, LLC. (Terrell, Alyson)
January 14, 2020 Filing 219 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Plaintiff Frieda Aaron, Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield served on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (cb) Modified docket text on 1/15/2020 (eh).
January 14, 2020 Filing 218 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Plaintiff Frieda Aaron, Defendants The Christ Hospital, Inc. served on 1/4/2020, answer due 1/27/2020; USF Holland, LLC served on 1/4/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (cb) Modified docket text on 1/14/2020 (cb).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #210 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #185 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative, Motion to Sever or Dismiss filed by Defendant The Phia Group. Plaintiffs are GRANTED and extension of time, through and including 3/30/2020, in which to file their memorandum in opposition to Defendant The Phia Group, LLC's motion to dismiss or to sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/13/2020. (km)
January 13, 2020 Filing 216 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc., WellCare Health Plans, Inc., The WellCare Management Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WellCare Health Plans, Inc., Corporate Parent The WellCare Management Group, Inc. for Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc... (Johnson, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 214 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Atlas Roofing Corp., Hood Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hood Companies, Inc. for Atlas Roofing Corp... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. - List of Insurance Companies) (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
January 13, 2020 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse L Jenike-Godshalk for Defendant Atlas Roofing Corp. (Jenike-Godshalk, Jesse)
January 13, 2020 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip T Bollin for Defendant Atlas Roofing Corp. (Bollin, Kip)
January 10, 2020 Filing 215 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Inc.. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020; Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (bjc) Modified File Date on 1/13/2020 (bjc).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #191 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Recently Added Defendants. Plaintiffs shall complete all steps to serve newly-added defendants Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, The Christ Hospital, O'Donnell, Schwartz & Anderson and USF Holland, LLC with service of process by 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/10/2020. (km)
January 10, 2020 Filing 210 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #185 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative, Motion to Sever or Dismiss Defendant the Phia Group MOTION to Sever, #178 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, New date requested 3/30/2020. by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Jodi Behrendt, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Joel Blair, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Glen Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Emma Burlile, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Doug Callahan, Patrick Calligan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Christina Canfield, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Sherri Cinquina-Listermann, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Michael Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Jacob Cotter, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Kali Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, Henry Curry, Samantha Curtis-Hamilton, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Dana Edwards, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Patsy Ervin, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Mark Funk, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Larry Stephen Hayes, Douglas Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Emily Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Damion Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Kelly Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Joshua Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman-Houston, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Nicholas Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Thomas Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Moore, Debra Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Harold J Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Hobert Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Desiree Peyton, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Steven Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Alexandra Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Shirley Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Nodra West, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Debra Wheeler, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Martha White-Hutton, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Jared Wolfe, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 209 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Cigna Health Corporation, Cigna Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Cigna Health Corporation.. (Taggart, Carolyn)
January 9, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Frederick Berliner for Defendant Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc. (Berliner, Alan)
January 9, 2020 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Paul Johnson for Defendant Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc. (Johnson, Robert)
January 9, 2020 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Darnell Craft for Defendants Health Alliance Midwest, Inc., The Carl Foundation (Craft, Brent)
January 9, 2020 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Darnell Craft for Defendant Medical Benefits Administrators, Inc. (Craft, Brent)
January 9, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Alan Holaday for Defendants Health Alliance Midwest, Inc., The Carl Foundation (Holaday, Rodney)
January 9, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Alan Holaday for Defendant Medical Benefits Administrators, Inc. (Holaday, Rodney)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER dismissing without prejudice defendant Passport Health Plan. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 1/9/2020. (wam)
January 9, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Masters Starts for Defendant Allied Benefits Systems, Inc. (Starts, Carrie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D. Reed for Defendant Medical Mutual of Ohio (Reed, Bradley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Koehler for Defendant Medical Mutual of Ohio (Koehler, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Farkas for Defendant Medical Mutual of Ohio (Farkas, Gregory)
January 8, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Earl Smith for Defendant Medical Mutual of Ohio (Smith, Michael)
January 8, 2020 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana P. Crawford for Defendant Cigna Health Corporation (Crawford, Ana)
January 8, 2020 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Ann Taggart for Defendant Cigna Health Corporation (Taggart, Carolyn)
January 7, 2020 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Masters Starts for Defendant KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association (Starts, Carrie)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/3/2020. (ss)
January 2, 2020 Filing 192 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #169 Amended Complaint and #189 Alias Summons Issued. (cb)
January 2, 2020 Filing 191 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/31/2020. to Serve Seven Recently Added Defendants by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Jodi Behrendt, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Joel Blair, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Glen Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Emma Burlile, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Doug Callahan, Patrick Calligan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Christina Canfield, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Sherri Cinquina-Listermann, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Michael Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Jacob Cotter, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Kali Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, Henry Curry, Samantha Curtis-Hamilton, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Dana Edwards, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Patsy Ervin, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Mark Funk, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Larry Stephen Hayes, Douglas Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Emily Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Damion Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Kelly Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Joshua Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman-Houston, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Nicholas Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Thomas Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Moore, Debra Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Harold J Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Hobert Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Desiree Peyton, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Steven Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Alexandra Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Shirley Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Nodra West, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Debra Wheeler, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Martha White-Hutton, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Jared Wolfe, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 190 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Blue Cross Blue Shield, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Inc., O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson, The Christ Hospital, Inc., USF Holland, LLC. (jlw)
December 27, 2019 Filing 189 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 188 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Frieda Aaron as to The Christ Hospital, Inc.. (cb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson A Terrell for Defendants Rawling and Associates, PLLC, The Rawlings Company, LLC (Terrell, Alyson)
December 20, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon L Beck for Defendant The Phia Group, LLC (Beck, Jonathon)
December 20, 2019 Filing 185 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative, Motion to Sever or Dismiss Defendant the Phia Group by Defendant The Phia Group, LLC. (Beck, Jonathon). Added MOTION to Sever on 12/23/2019 (eh).
December 19, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Shaw for Defendant Russell & Oliver, PLLC (Shaw, Mark)
December 13, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Katheryn M Lloyd for Defendants Equian, LLC, Golden Rule Insurance (United Healthcare), Golden Rule Insurance Company, UMR, Inc., United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Golden Rule Ins. Co.) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
December 13, 2019 Filing 182 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Plaintiff Frieda Aaron, Defendant Caresource served on 11/21/2019, answer due 3/9/2020. (cb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 181 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Plaintiff Frieda Aaron, Aetna Better Health of Kentucky served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Aetna Better Health of Kentucky Insurance Company served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019; Aetna Health, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Allied Benefits Systems, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; Amerigroup of Ohio, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc. served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019; Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Benefit Recovery Group served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Health & Welfare Fund served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Cigna Health Corporation served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Community Insurance Company served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Conduent Business Services, LLC served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019; Continental Life served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Corvel Corporation served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Duke Energy served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Equian, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; FEP Service served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Golden Rule Insurance Company served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Good Samaritan Hospital served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Government Employees Health Association, Inc. (GEHA) served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Health Alliance Midwest, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Healthplus HP, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Healthsmart - Cincinnati served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association Inc. (KIGA) served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; MHBH - The Mail Handler's Benefit Plan served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Medical Benefits Administrators, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Medical Mutual of Ohio served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Meridian Roofing Corporation (Atlas Roofing Corporation) served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; NGS American served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; National Government Services, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Rawling and Associates, PLLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Russell & Oliver, PLLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Sheakley Unicomp, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; The Carl Foundation served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; The Phia Group, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; The Rawlings Company, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; UMR, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; United Health Group Incorporated served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc. served on 11/28/2019, answer due 12/19/2019. (cb) (cb).
December 11, 2019 Filing 180 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson. (cb) Modified Docket Text on 12/12/2019 (bjc).
December 11, 2019 Filing 179 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama. (cb) Modified docket text on 12/11/2019 (cb). Modified Docket Text on 12/12/2019 (bjc).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #176 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. It is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs shall serve all newly added Defendants in this action by 1/3/2020; (2) All newly added Defendants shall file a notice of appearance by 1/22/2020 in lieu answering or otherwise responding to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; (3) All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by 3/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/9/2019. (km)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 AGREED ORDER dismissing defendant Good Samaritan Hospital of Dayton, OH. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 12/3/19. (wam)
December 2, 2019 Filing 176 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by Defendant Cigna Healthcare, Inc.. (Taggart, Carolyn)
November 20, 2019 Filing 175 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #169 Complaint and #170 Summons Issued. (cb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 174 Summons Issued as to AETNA. (bjc)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER dismissing party BCBS West Virginia Highmark with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/18/19. (wam)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER dismissing Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/18/19. (wam)
November 15, 2019 Filing 171 Summons Issued as to Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Better Health of Kentucky Insurance Company, Aetna Better Health of Kentucky, Allied Benefits Systems, Inc., Amerigroup of Ohio Inc., Amerigroup Community Care Amerigroup Ohio, Inc., Anthem blue Cross Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Kentucky, Inc., Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., Benefit Recovery Group, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Inc., Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Caresource, Central States Southeast & Southwest Areas Health & Welfare Fund, The Christ Hospital, Inc., Cigna Health Corporation, Community Insurance Company, d/b/a Anthem, Conduent Business Services, LLC., Continental Life, Corvel Corporation, Duke Energy, Equian LLC., FEP Service, Golden Rule Insurance Company, Good Samaritan Hospital, Government Employees Health Association, Inc. (GEHA)., Health Alliance Midwest, Inc., d/b/a Health Alliance, Healthplus HP, LLC d/b/a Empire Bluecross and Blueshield (New York) and d/b/a Empire Healthchoice HMO, Inc., Healthsmart - Cincinnati, Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc., Kentucky Insurance Guranty Association Inc.(KIGA)., Medical Benefits Administrators, Inc., Medical Mutual of Ohio, Meridian Roofing Corporation (Atlas Roofing Corporation), MHBH - The Mail Handler's Benefit Plan, Molina Healthcare of Ohio, Inc., National Government Services, Inc., d/b/a administar C T Corporation System, MGS American, O'Donnell Schwartz & Anderson, Rawlings and Associates, PLLC., Russell & Oliver, PLLC., The Rawlings Company, LLC., Sedgiwck Claims Management Services, Inc., Sheakley Unicomp, Inc., The Carl Foundation d/b/a Health Alliance, The Phia Group, LLC., UMR, Inc. d/b/a United Medical Resources, United Health Group Incorporated d/b/a Optum, United Healthcare Insurance Company, USF Holland, LLC., Wellcare Health Insurance Company of Kentucky, Inc. (cb) Modified docket text on 12/11/2019 (cb).
November 14, 2019 Filing 170 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form, #11 Summons Form, #12 Summons Form, #13 Summons Form, #14 Summons Form, #15 Summons Form, #16 Summons Form, #17 Summons Form, #18 Summons Form, #19 Summons Form, #20 Summons Form, #21 Summons Form, #22 Summons Form, #23 Summons Form, #24 Summons Form, #25 Summons Form, #26 Summons Form, #27 Summons Form, #28 Summons Form, #29 Summons Form, #30 Summons Form, #31 Summons Form, #32 Summons Form, #33 Summons Form, #34 Summons Form, #35 Summons Form, #36 Summons Form, #37 Summons Form, #38 Summons Form, #39 Summons Form, #40 Summons Form, #41 Summons Form, #42 Summons Form, #43 Summons Form, #44 Summons Form, #45 Summons Form, #46 Summons Form, #47 Summons Form, #48 Summons Form, #49 Summons Form, #50 Summons Form, #51 Summons Form, #52 Summons Form, #53 Summons Form, #54 Summons Form, #55 Summons Form, #56 Summons Form, #57 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 169 AMENDED COMPLAINT by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by Frieda Aaron. (Winter, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #167 Plaintiff Gail Nordeman's Motion to Substitute Party. Harold J Nordeman, the Executor of the Estate of Gail A Nordeman, Deceased, is substituted as a Plaintiff in the place of his decedent, Gail Nordeman, without prejudice to the proceedings already had. The docket sheet and all other court records in this action shall reflect Harold J Nordeman, the Executor of the Estate of Gail A Nordeman, Deceased, as substituted Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/17/2019. (km)
October 16, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Gail Nordeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executor's Letters of Authority, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Plaintiffs' Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their First Amended Complaint by 10/28/2019. Defendants shall file and serve their responses to the First Amended Complaint by 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/15/2019. (km)
October 11, 2019 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 10/28/2019. by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Patrick Callagan, Doug Callahan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Jean Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Samantha Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Sr, Larry Stephen Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Martha Hutton, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Josh Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Tom Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Jane Moore, Debbie Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Ali Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert)
October 5, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE by Plaintiff Gail Nordeman Suggestion of Death of Plaintiff Gail Nordeman (Winter, Robert)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Plaintiffs' Third Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their First Amended Complaint by 10/14/2019. Defendants shall file and serve their responses to the First Amended Complaint by 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/1/2019. (km)
September 30, 2019 Filing 162 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 10/14/2019. by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Patrick Callagan, Doug Callahan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Jean Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Samantha Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Sr, Larry Stephen Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Martha Hutton, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Josh Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Tom Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Jane Moore, Debbie Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Ali Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kentucky Medicaid. Kentucky Medicaid served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (cb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana P. Crawford for Defendant Cigna Healthcare, Inc. (Crawford, Ana)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #158 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their First Amended Complaint by 9/30/2019. Defendants shall file and serve their responses to the First Amended Complaint by 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/12/2019. (km)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Agreed ORDER dismissing party Health Alliance. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/11/19. (wam)
September 11, 2019 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Patrick Callagan, Doug Callahan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Jean Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Samantha Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Sr, Larry Stephen Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Martha Hutton, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Josh Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Tom Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Jane Moore, Debbie Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Ali Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) Modified Docket Text on 9/12/2019 (bjc).
September 10, 2019 Filing 157 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #156 Summons Issued. (eh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 156 Summons Issued as to Kentucky Medicaid. (jlw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford W Lauchlan for Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Lauchlan, Clifford)
September 6, 2019 Filing 154 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. for Kentucky Medicaid (Maraan, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Agreed ORDER dismissing party Centene terminated.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/5/19. (wam)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Agreed ORDER dismissing party. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/5/19. (wam)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Agreed ORDER dismissing Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/5/19. (wam)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Agreed ORDER dismissing defendant MEDBEN terminated.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 9/5/19. (wam)
September 3, 2019 Minute Order. Telephone Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/3/2019. Plaintiffs orally moved the Court to amend the complaint, indicating the types of changes anticipated in the amended complaint. Defendants did not object. Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' first amended complaint is due by 9/16/2019. Defendants' deadline to respond or otherwise move is set for 11/8/2019. Plaintiffs' responses are due 30 days after filing. Defendants' replies are due 14 days thereafter. All discovery is stayed pending a decision on the to be filed motions to dismiss. (km)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Agreed ORDER dismissing Blue Cross Blue Sheild New Jersey. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/22/19. (wam)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Agreed ORDER dismissing BCBS Illinois Health Care Service Corporation and BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 8/22/19. (wam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Frieda Aaron. (Winter, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Marquette National Life Insurance. Marquette National Life Insurance served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (bjc)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 AGREED ORDER Dismissing with prejudice KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/23/19. (wam)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATED ORDER OF MISJOINDER, Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 7/23/19. (wam)
July 19, 2019 Filing 142 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Passport Health Plan. (Winslow, Kyle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle M. Winslow for Defendant Passport Health Plan (Winslow, Kyle)
July 19, 2019 Notice of Correction re: 139 140 - both entries are proposed agreed/stipulated entries of dismissal which require signature of the Court. Per Section 2.4 of the Court's CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, all proposed orders requiring signature of the Court shall be emailed to the chambers of the assigned judge and not electronically filed. Accordingly, both of these orders have been removed and submitted to the chambers of Judge Dlott for signature. The orders will be re-docketed after signature of the Court is obtained. Counsel is reminded that all future proposed order should be emailed to the chambers of the assigned judge. (km)
July 19, 2019 Filing 140 [DOCUMENT REMOVED - PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRING SIGNATURE OF COURT] STIPULATION of dismissal of defendant Kentucky Life and Health Guaranty Association by Plaintiff Penny Brackett. (Winter, Robert) Modified Docket Text on 7/19/2019 (km).
July 18, 2019 Filing 139 [DOCUMENT REMOVED - PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRING SIGNATURE OF COURT] STIPULATION Stipulated Order of Misjoinder by Defendant Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company. (Lasley, Aneca) Modified Docket Text on 7/19/2019 (km).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER re #138 Plaintiff's Status Report. Plaintiffs are granted an additional 21 days, through and including 8/8/2019, in which to perfect service of the Complaint upon Defendant Marquette National. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/18/2019. (km)
July 17, 2019 Filing 138 STATUS REPORT BY ALL PLAINTIFFS by Plaintiff Frieda Aaron. (Winter, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 137 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #1 Complaint and #136 Summons Issued. (cb). (cb)
July 15, 2019 Remark - the 7/19/2019 Answer date as to Defendant Benovation CAI Insurance Company #130 is terminated per the Court's Order of 12/6/2018 #23 . Defendant has fully complied with the Court's Order by filing an appearance of counsel. (km)
July 15, 2019 Filing 136 Summons Issued as to Universal American - Marquette National c/o CT Corporation System. (eh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 135 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. On Universal American - Marquette National (Maraan, Benjamin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 134 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Marquette National Life Insurance. (bjc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Hojnoski for Defendant Benovation CAI Insurance Company (Hojnoski, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Masters Starts for Defendant Benovation CAI Insurance Company (Starts, Carrie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 131 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation. BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (bjc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Benovation CAI Insurance Company, Passport Health Plan. Benovation CAI Insurance Company served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Passport Health Plan served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (bjc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (sct)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AGREED ORDER that Plaintiff Brenda Conley and defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, by and through their respective counsel, hereby stipulate and agree that all claims of said plaintiff against said defendant asserted in this action be, and they are, dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. R. 41(a)(2). All of said plaintiffs claims remain against all other defendants and are unaffected by this Agreed Order.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/26/19. (wam)
June 24, 2019 Filing 127 Alias Summons Issued as to Benovation CAI Insurance Company, BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation, Marquette National Life Insurance Company, Passport Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (sct) Modified to correct parties on 7/9/2019 (sct).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants Benovation CAI Insurance Company, Marquette National Life Insurance Company and Passport Health Plan. Plaintiffs shall complete all steps to serve these three Defendants with service of process by Wednesday, 7/17/2019, and file written notice on the Court's docket after doing so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/24/2019. (km)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Correction re #125 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Document included a Motion for Extension of time. Clerk added the motion relief, modified docket text, and regenerated NEF. (sct)
June 17, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants and RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Frieda Aaron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) Modified docket text and added motion event on 6/18/2019 (sct).
June 17, 2019 Filing 124 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 123 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause in writing within 20 days of the entry date of this Order why Defendants Benovation CAI Insurance Company, Marguette National Life Insurance Company and Passport Health Plan should not be dismissed without prejudice from this action for failure of service of process. Show Cause Response due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/28/2019. (km)
May 12, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Janet Cornett, Jordan Vance (Winter, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE by Defendant MEDBEN of Withdrawal of Counsel (Spina, Anthony)
May 9, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE by Defendant Health Alliance of Withdrawal of Counsel (Spina, Anthony)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick F. Mastrian, III. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 4/5/19. (wam)
March 29, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6860696) of Patrick F. Mastrian by Defendant Healthspan / Healthspan Preferred. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Jackson, Susan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Healthspan / Healthspan Preferred. (Jackson, Susan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan H Jackson for Defendant Healthspan / Healthspan Preferred (Jackson, Susan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LIBERTY BANKERS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY by Plaintiffs. (Maraan, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 3/26/2019 (eh).
March 15, 2019 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC. (Ramsey, Jamie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 112 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Health Alliance. (Holaday, Rodney)
February 14, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Madden for Defendant Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company (Ammer, Timothy) Modified docket text on 2/15/2019 (eh).
February 14, 2019 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company. (Ammer, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell Madden. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/13/19. (wam)
February 6, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6782709) of Mitchell Madden by Defendant Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company. (Ammer, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Ammer for Defendant Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company (Ammer, Timothy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc., Humana Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Humana Inc. for Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc... (Kiefer, Daran)
January 11, 2019 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company. (Kuley, Lauren)
January 9, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Gerlach for Defendant Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association (Gerlach, Kyle)
January 9, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Maley for Defendant Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association (Maley, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Musekamp for Defendants Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc., Centene, Medicaid Buckeye (Musekamp, George)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Abate. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John B. Lawrence and Matthew G. Sheridan. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott. (wam)
January 4, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Anthem BCBS Virginia Anthem, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 4, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant BCBS Kentucky Anthem Insurance Co. (Abrams, Wesley)
January 4, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia (Abrams, Wesley)
January 4, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield Comunity Insurance Company (Abrams, Wesley)
January 3, 2019 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Cigna Healthcare, Inc./Connecticut General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Cigna Healthcare, Inc... (Taggart, Carolyn) Modified on 1/4/2019 (eh).
January 3, 2019 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Cigna Healthcare, Inc., Cigna Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Cigna Healthcare, Inc... (Taggart, Carolyn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 93 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Passport Health Plan. (bjc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Anthem BCBS Virginia Anthem, Inc. (Britt, Kent)
January 3, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant BCBS Kentucky Anthem Insurance Co. (Britt, Kent)
January 3, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia (Britt, Kent)
January 3, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield Comunity Insurance Company (Britt, Kent)
January 2, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Spina for Defendant MEDBEN (Spina, Anthony)
January 2, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Spina for Defendant Health Alliance (Spina, Anthony)
January 2, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6734826) of Michael P. Abate by Defendant Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc.. (Kiefer, Daran)
December 28, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Darnell Craft for Defendant Health Alliance (Craft, Brent)
December 28, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Alan Holaday for Defendant Health Alliance (Holaday, Rodney)
December 27, 2018 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia, Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia.. (Britt, Kent)
December 27, 2018 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Community Insurance Company, Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Community Insurance Company.. (Britt, Kent)
December 27, 2018 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Amerigroup Corp., Anthem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Anthem, Inc. for Amerigroup Corp... (Britt, Kent)
December 27, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Gerlach for Defendant Aflac (Gerlach, Kyle)
December 26, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Maley for Defendant Aflac (Maley, John)
December 26, 2018 Filing 78 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to BCBS Illinois Health Care Service Corporation. (bjc)
December 26, 2018 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Florida. Blue Cross Blue Shield Florida served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (bjc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant GEHA. (Wayne, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-6728240) of John B. Lawrence and Matthew G. Sheridan by Defendants AETNA, AETNA Kentucky, Medicaid Coventry Care Coventry Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John B. Lawrence, #2 Affidavit of Matthew G. Sheridan) (Fogarty, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc., Centene, Centene Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Centene Corporation for Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc... (Johnson, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Robert Paul Johnson substituting for Heather M. Hawkins as to Defendants Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc., Centene, Medicaid Buckeye. (Johnson, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants MEDBEN, Medical Benefits Mutual Life Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Medical Benefits Mutual Life Insurance Co. for MEDBEN.. (Holaday, Rodney)
December 21, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Stuart Wayne for Defendant GEHA (Wayne, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association. (Wolfla, Paul)
December 21, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alan Wolfla for Defendant KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association (Wolfla, Paul)
December 20, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield (Abrams, Wesley)
December 20, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield (Britt, Kent)
December 20, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Austin Vogt for Defendant Kentucky Medicaid (Vogt, Blake)
December 20, 2018 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AETNA, Aetna Better Health Inc. (Ohio), Aetna Health Holdings, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Aetna Health Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Aetna Better Health Inc. (Ohio) for AETNA.. (Fogarty, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant BCBS Massachusetts. (Burke, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eugene Burke for Defendant BCBS Massachusetts (Burke, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant BCBS Minnesota BCBSM Inc. BCBS Minnesota BCBSM Inc served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (bjc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Community Insurance Company (Abrams, Wesley)
December 20, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Amerigroup Corp. (Abrams, Wesley)
December 20, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Community Insurance Company (Britt, Kent)
December 20, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Allen Britt for Defendant Amerigroup Corp. (Britt, Kent)
December 19, 2018 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Golden Rule Insurance (United Healthcare). (Lloyd, Katheryn)
December 19, 2018 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Golden Rule Ins. Co.). (Lloyd, Katheryn)
December 19, 2018 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Custom Design Benefits QI Services. (Sparks, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R Sparks for Defendant Custom Design Benefits QI Services (Sparks, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 53 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation. (bjc)
December 19, 2018 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant BCBS North Carolina. (Burke, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Sheild New Jersey. (Burke, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eugene Burke for Defendants BCBS North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Sheild New Jersey (Burke, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jerome Fogarty for Defendants AETNA, AETNA Kentucky, Medicaid Coventry Care Coventry Health Care (Fogarty, Robert)
December 18, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Kuley for Defendant Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company (Kuley, Lauren)
December 18, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Aneca E Lasley for Defendant Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company (Lasley, Aneca)
December 18, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC answer due 1/9/2019. (bjc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield. Blue Cross Blue Shield served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (bjc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 45 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Marguette National Life Insurance Company. (bjc)
December 17, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendant Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC. (Ramsey, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie M Ramsey for Defendant Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC (Ramsey, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Lampley, Nathaniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants BCBS Illinois Health Care Service Corporation, BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation. (Burke, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Tennessee, Inc.. (Burke, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by James Eugene Burke for Defendants BCBS Illinois Health Care Service Corporation, BCBS Texas Health Care Service Corporation, Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Tennessee, Inc. (Burke, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Ann Taggart for Defendant Cigna Healthcare, Inc. (Taggart, Carolyn)
December 13, 2018 Filing 37 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Benovation CAI Insurance Company. (bjc)
December 12, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Daran P Kiefer for Defendant Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc. (Kiefer, Daran)
December 12, 2018 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Downey, Brian)
December 12, 2018 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Life, Inc., Hartford Holdings, Inc., Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc... (Downey, Brian)
December 12, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P Downey for Defendant Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Downey, Brian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant BCBS Massachusetts. BCBS Massachusetts served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (bjc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Aflac, Amerigroup Corp., GEHA, Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Golden Rule Ins. Co.). Aflac served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; Amerigroup Corp. served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018; GEHA served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018; Hartford - Disability Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018; KIGA Kentucky Life And Health Insurance Guaranty Association served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018; United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Golden Rule Ins. Co.) served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (bjc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Frederick Berliner for Defendants Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc., Centene (Berliner, Alan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather MacGregor Hawkins for Defendants Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc., Centene (Hawkins, Heather)
December 7, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Katheryn M Lloyd for Defendants Golden Rule Insurance (United Healthcare), United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Golden Rule Ins. Co.) (Lloyd, Katheryn)
December 7, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. re #25 Notice of Appearance (Abrams, Wesley)
December 7, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Abrams for Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Abrams, Wesley)
December 7, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Lampley, Jr for Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Lampley, Nathaniel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Anthem BCBS Virginia Anthem, Inc., BCBS North Carolina, Centene, MEDBEN. Anthem BCBS Virginia Anthem, Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; BCBS North Carolina served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Centene served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018; MEDBEN served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (bjc)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part #20 Defendant BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc's Motion for Telephonic Status Conference and for a Indefinite Stay of Responsive Deadlines Pending the Entry of an Agreed Schedule. IT IS ORDERED that each properly served defendant shall file ONLY a notice of appearance by their respective answer due date. All other deadlines for all defendants to answer, plead or otherwise move in response to the Complaint, including but not limited to the 12/18/2018 deadline applicable to Highmark, are hereby stayed and extended pending the Status Conference and the time period allowed by the Scheduling Order entered after the Status Conference. The Status Conference shall be scheduled by the Court at such time after all defendants have had counsel enter an appearance in this case or the deadline to do so has expired. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 12/6/2018. (km)
December 5, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Darnell Craft for Defendant MEDBEN (Craft, Brent)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Alan Holaday for Defendant MEDBEN (Holaday, Rodney)
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Motion for Telephonic Status Conference and for a Indefinite Stay of Repsonsive Deadlines Pending the Entry of an Agreed Schedule by Defendant BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Burke, James). Added MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) on 12/6/2018 (eh).
December 4, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Veterans Administration answer due 1/28/2019. (sct)
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Veterans Administration. (bjc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Veterans Administration. (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 12/4/2018 (bjc).
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants AETNA, AETNA Kentucky, Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company, Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield Comunity Insurance Company, BCBS Kentucky Anthem Insurance Co., Blue Cross Blue Sheild New Jersey, Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia, Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Tennessee, Inc., Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc., Cigna Healthcare, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Golden Rule Insurance (United Healthcare), Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc., Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association, Kentucky Medicaid, Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company, Medicaid Buckeye, Medicaid Coventry Care Coventry Health Care, Medicaid Kenpac, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Veterans Administration. AETNA served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; AETNA Kentucky served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Allied Insurance Company of America Corporation Service Company served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield Comunity Insurance Company served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; BCBS Kentucky Anthem Insurance Co. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Blue Cross Blue Sheild New Jersey served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Blue Cross Blue Shield Georgia served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018; Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Tennessee, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Buckeye Community Health Plan Solutions, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Cigna Healthcare, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Community Insurance Company served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Golden Rule Insurance (United Healthcare) served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Humana Health Plan of Ohio, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Indiana Comprehensive Health Insurance Association served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Kentucky Medicaid served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Liberty Banker's Life Insurance Company served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Medicaid Buckeye served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Medicaid Coventry Care Coventry Health Care served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Medicaid Kenpac served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018; Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018 (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 12/4/2018 (bjc).
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC. Medicaid Passport Health PPH Ohio LLC served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (bjc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Custom Design Benefits QI Services, Healthspan / Healthspan Preferred. Custom Design Benefits QI Services served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018; Healthspan / Healthspan Preferred served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (bjc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Medicaid Caresource. Medicaid Caresource served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (bjc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Community Insurance Company, Health Alliance. Community Insurance Company served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018; Health Alliance served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (bjc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: #1 Tracking Info) (bjc). Modified on 11/29/2018 (eh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: #2 Tracking Info) (bjc).
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on November 26, 2018. (jlw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw).
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Albert Winter, Jr for Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Josh Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelheimer, Nancy Begley, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Leeann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Timothy Byrd, Patrick Callagan, Doug Callahan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary L Coots, Janet Cornett, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Jean Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Samantha Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Hayes, Sr, Larry Stephen Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Houghton, Sr, Robert Houghton, Jr, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Martha Hutton, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Dillon Jones, Joan Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Josh Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Rhonda Mains, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marcheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Traci Mathews, Brandon Mathis, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Tom Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Jane Moore, Debbie Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Ali Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Donald Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Stamps, Jr, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Darlene Sterling, Bert Stidham, Deon Stigall, Jr, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hills, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo (Winter, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc.. (Burke, James)
October 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc. answer due 12/18/2018. (km)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Defendant BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to them and to all other Defendants who request such relief an additional 60 days within which to answer, plead or otherwise to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/19/2018. (km)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/18/2018. by Defendant BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Burke, James)
October 19, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/19/2018. , this document has been removed per the request of the filer and the motio has been terminated, the filer will file a corrected version. (bjc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/19/2018. by Defendant BCBS West Virginia Highmark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Burke, James) Modified Docket Text on 10/19/2018 (bjc).
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Medicaid Caresource, CareSource Management Group Co. identifying Corporate Parent CareSource Management Group Co. for Medicaid Caresource.. (Maley, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle R. Gerlach for Defendant Medicaid Caresource (Gerlach, Kyle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Maley for Defendant Medicaid Caresource (Maley, John)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Veterans Administration. (sct)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form, #11 Summons Form, #12 Summons Form, #13 Summons Form, #14 Summons Form, #15 Summons Form, #16 Summons Form, #17 Summons Form, #18 Summons Form, #19 Summons Form, #20 Summons Form, #21 Summons Form, #22 Summons Form, #23 Summons Form, #24 Summons Form, #25 Summons Form, #26 Summons Form, #27 Summons Form, #28 Summons Form, #29 Summons Form, #30 Summons Form, #31 Summons Form, #32 Summons Form, #33 Summons Form, #34 Summons Form, #35 Summons Form, #36 Summons Form, #37 Summons Form, #38 Summons Form, #39 Summons Form, #40 Summons Form, #41 Summons Form, #42 Summons Form, #43 Summons Form, #44 Summons Form, #45 Summons Form, #46 Summons Form) (sct)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman (vp)
September 10, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6591368), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form, #11 Summons Form, #12 Summons Form, #13 Summons Form, #14 Summons Form, #15 Summons Form, #16 Summons Form, #17 Summons Form, #18 Summons Form, #19 Summons Form, #20 Summons Form, #21 Summons Form, #22 Summons Form, #23 Summons Form, #24 Summons Form, #25 Summons Form, #26 Summons Form, #27 Summons Form, #28 Summons Form, #29 Summons Form, #30 Summons Form, #31 Summons Form, #32 Summons Form, #33 Summons Form, #34 Summons Form, #35 Summons Form, #36 Summons Form, #37 Summons Form, #38 Summons Form, #39 Summons Form, #40 Summons Form, #41 Summons Form, #42 Summons Form, #43 Summons Form, #44 Summons Form, #45 Summons Form, #46 Summons Form, #47 Summons Form, #48 Summons Form, #49 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 9/10/2018 (sct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron et al v. AETNA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Elliott
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Lilly
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Esselman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Callagan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harris
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Beyer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hatfield
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Warren
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Callahan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruvimbo Nyemba
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Doyle
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Spangenberg
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Zureick
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Brewer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Rose
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Langford
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Potts
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Helton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Griessman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Koehler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thiessen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominque Bray
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brophy
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Young
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi McKinney
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Batsche
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joi Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mathis
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Legendre
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Allen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edythe Bishop
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Keplinger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lacinak
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Haggard
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mauntel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Deck
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caela Finnell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Knauer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Williams
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Reed
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Wheeler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Brewer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Payne
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthie Sears
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gardner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Koehler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne List
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Buschur
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Shott
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Waxler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Smith
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McCaughey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hartness
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Pummell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Cornett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirstin Weisman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hounchell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McClure
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bayliss
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Bray
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Casey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Begley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Mathews
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Janson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Crissinger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Foster
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram McCauley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Hamilton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Fields
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Willoughby
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bode
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Frazier
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Lynn Allen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Theilman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wyatt
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Scott
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Miller
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Fossett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Martin
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Wilder
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Walker
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Benjamin
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Messerschmidt
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Fenner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenna Shafer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Conley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Myers
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Howard
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Reifenberger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hickey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella McDonald
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mayer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Webber
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Meyer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Earls
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Dotson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Brunner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hannon
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Henderson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Walsh
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Bender
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Kibler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahmann Nisbett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Graber
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Pickett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Marshall
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Nordeman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Landrum
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Stallings
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Ieraci
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ailene Levan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Grabow
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlann Shepherd
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Wolsing
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Neu
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Runtz
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jessee
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek List
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Deaton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Thaeler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Greelish
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schuster
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Garrison
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Marcheschi
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Buechel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dugger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caidan Bailey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schimmel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dabney
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Underwood
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Eder
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Leeann Brown
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Powers
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Jonas
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Conger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry McNeal
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin James
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia McQueary
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Deaton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Drafts
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Kauffman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francene Cook
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Holley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda Aaron
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Ebbing
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bookman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bess
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Boggs
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Osborn
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Masters
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Riley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Howell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bates
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Agee
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Couch
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orris Smoote
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Benge
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jones
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Handorf
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Beil
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Coots
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Feltner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]