Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Plaintiff: Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00649
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Grashoff for Plaintiff Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture (Grashoff, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendant The Guarantee Company of North America USA Corporate Disclosure Statement (Yocum, Thomas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 The Guarantee Company of North America USA's ANSWER to #3 Complaint Filed by Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Yocum, Thomas)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant The Guarantee Company of North America USA re #1 Notice of Removal, (Yocum, Thomas)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against The Guarantee Company of North America USA, filed by Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture. Filed in Scioto County Court of Common Pleas on 8/21/2018 as case number 18CIH151 (jlw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Matthew K. Grashoff (jlw)
September 17, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scioto County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18CIH151 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6600377), filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Yocum, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portsmouth JV, A Joint Venture
Represented By: Aaron Steven Evenchik
Represented By: Matthew Grashoff
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Natale
Represented By: O Judson Scheaf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: Thomas Russell Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?