Dapper et al v. Board of Trustees of Anderson Township Ohio

Appellant: Kathleen Dapper and Stephen H. Dapper
In Re: Kathleen A. Dapper
Appellee: Board of Trustees of Anderson Township Ohio
Case Number: 1:2018cv00665
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Appellee Board of Trustees of Anderson Township Ohio Correspondence to Clerk of Courts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit docket text information) (Fischer, Cynthia)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 11/5/2018. Appellee Brief due by 11/19/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal Doc. # 37, #2 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Doc. # 34, #3 Motion to Dismiss Doc # 10) (sct)
September 24, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Kathleen Dapper, Stephen H. Dapper. The parties briefing schedule will be established once the District Court receives the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Certification of Record on Appeal. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:18-bk-11693. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal, #2 Transmittal Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Docket Sheet) (sct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dapper et al v. Board of Trustees of Anderson Township Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kathleen Dapper
Represented By: Harry Leon Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen H. Dapper
Represented By: Harry Leon Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kathleen A. Dapper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Board of Trustees of Anderson Township Ohio
Represented By: Cynthia Margot Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?