Aaron et al v. Hamilton County Clerk's Office et al
Plaintiff: Roger Johnson, Richard Elliott, Adrian Lilly, Tracy Esselman, Chelsea Johnson, Alisa Wilson, Patrick Callagan, David Harris, Leona Beyer, Wayne Hatfield, Haley Warren, Doug Callahan, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Deborah Doyle, Sherry Spangenberg, Mary Zureick, Randy Brewer, Dorothy Rose, Lyndon Langford, Jeff Potts, Theresa Helton, Carla Griessman, Edward Thiessen, Dominque Bray, Michael Brophy, JoAnn Young, Robert Sr. Houghton, Candi McKinney, Laura Batsche, Joi Crowe, Brandon Mathis, Patricia Legendre, Jimmy Allen, Edythe Bishop, Michele Keplinger, Brandon Lacinak, Kevin Haggard, Donald Mauntel, Damon Deck, Caela Finnell, Maggie Knauer, Kelly Williams, Danielle Reed, Lonnie Wheeler, Jeremy Brewer, Haley Payne, Ruthie Sears, Judith Gardner, Rose Koehler, Lynne List, Vicki Buschur, Patricia Shott, Elaine Waxler, Christopher McCaughey, Kevin Hartness, Carol Pummell, Janet Cornett, Kirstin Weisman, Debbie Moore, Ricky Hounchell, Barbara McClure, Steven Bayliss, Lindsey Bray, Ashley Casey, Ronald Schuster, Nancy Begley, Tracy Janson, Karen Crissinger, Angelina Foster, Hiram McCauley, Dorothea Hamilton, Damian Fields, Patrick Willoughby, Anthony Bode, Joann Frazier, Brittany Theilman, Kelly Jones, Cheryl Wyatt, Delores Scott, Taura Halbert, Lennie Fossett, Julie Martin, Troy Wilder, Ashley Walker, Antoinette Benjamin, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Amber Johnson, Jean Fenner, Glenna Shafer, Brenda Conley, Jennifer Myers, Sharon Howard, Holly Reifenberger, Jennifer Hickey, Marcella McDonald, Kimberly Mayer, Daniel Webber, Diane Meyer, Darrell Earls, Carolyn Dotson, Jonathan Brunner, Timothy Hannon, Carrie Crowe, Debra Henderson, Lindsey Walsh, Mackenzie Bender, Karen Taylor, Martha Kibler, Rahmann Nisbett, Greg Graber, Heather Pickett, William Moore, Timothy Marshall, Gail Nordeman, Victoria Landrum, Eddie Stallings, Robert Densler, Ailene Levan, Stephanie Moore, Charlann Shepherd, Billy Wolsing, Gary Neu, Robert Runtz, Sarah Jessee, Derek List, Stefanie Deaton, Ben Thaeler, Erin Greelish, Gerald Hammons, Crystal Garrison, Angela Buechel, Billy Dugger, Jack Marscheschi, Forrest Crowe, Michelle Byrd, Caidan Bailey, Joseph Schimmel, William Dabney, Connie Underwood, Mona Eder, Bryan Powers, Sara Jonas, Kenneth Conger, Kerry McNeal, Melvin James, Tonia McQueary, Ollie Deaton, Douglas Drafts, Katelyn Kauffman, Francene Cook, Cathy Holley, Frieda Aaron, Chris Ebbing, Jennifer Bookman, Denise Bess, Kaitlyn Boggs, Timothy Osborn, Vicky Wilson, Elsa Ieraci, Jason Riley, Kathryn Howell, Kimberly Bates, Michelle Agee, Sandra Couch, Orris Smoote, Michael Odulana, Nick Benge, Tammy Jones, Ryan Handorf, Deon Jr. Stigall, Terry Beil, Gary Coots, Jacob Feltner, Richard Lozier, Marjorie Newman, Patrick Stephenson, Duane Pelfrey, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, Teresa Worley, Robin Schiller, Sara Selm, Tom Meyers, Paula Wilson, Mark Reed, Brooke Vandervort, Derrill Reynolds, Brenda Errgang, Jacob Durham, Kathleen Bushelman, Staci Smith, Mary Gerbus, Kevin McDonald, Barbara Couch, Brian Atkins, Lenora Haggard, Kameron McNeal, Tempie Stephenson, Michael Cotter, Katherine Walls, Robert Masters, Dana Conley, Denise Hamilton, Donald Moore, Earl Jr. Stamps, Mike Sand, Deborah Worley, Rebekah Brady, Christine Geralds, Shamiya Ford, Jeffrey Poff, Michael Crail, Asia Shannon, Judy Young, David Hall, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Helen Ward, Karen Sisson, David Snider, Elizabeth Compo, Ronald Rowley, Jetton Wilson, Reba Morgan, Sierra Stratman, Maurice Grabow, Jody Bauer, Priscilla Wittmeyer, Kimberly Jenkins, Sara Hauenstein, Junior Monroe, Josh Fogel, Nellie Davis, William Wolder, Karen Johnson, Jacqueline Judkins, Troy Fite, Veronica Yeakle, Amanda Koch, Crystal Pierce, Evelyn Helton, Penny Brackett, Trey Billing, Stacy John Martin, Debbie Rodriguez, Hannah Zymslo, Luke Holcomb, Jeffrey Hyde, Josh Roy, Melissa Habermehl, Vera Moffitt, Tom Lantry, Patricia Adams, Thomas Atkinson, Phyllis Bechtold, Andrew Carr, Tonya Chisman, Stephen Carmen, Jessica Hastings, Shawnda Benton, Richard Brorein, David Rohling, Robert Mounce, Teresa McMillen, Melissa Braucher, Paul Scholz, Alyssa Flatt, Arlene Fait, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Kathleen Teslcher, Patrick Schmit, Sandra Lemmel, Kristine Dority, Ryan Hensley, Laura Aker, Dawn Wingert, Dirk Hitchcock, Keith Young, Loretta Hon, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Sandra Roundtree, Nicholas Barkey, Kenny Wilson, Courtney Hammons, Joy Cullins, Kathy Hersley, Karen Higginbothan, Vivian Kiefer, Terry Wilson, Lyndsey Middendorf, Robert Campbell, Chelsea Hortman, Patrick Dugan, Lisa Conley, Corrine Zachry, Jordan Vance, Sharon Brice, Antoine Powell, Joseph Davis, Alissa Hightchew, Carol Ross, Andrew Schultz, Heather Slayback, Benjamin Williams, Violet Whalen, Maurine Langford, Stephanie Mueller, Angela Pennington, Mark McMurren, Michelle Noble, Kim Underwood, James Pumpelly, Christina Brashear, Grant McKenney, Jeff Peddicord, Carla Wooten, Adam Hartman, Sandra Dennis, Cathy Beil, David Conger, Clarence Phillips, Donna Good, Francine Ford, Natasha Lainhart, Irene Hyde, Eric Courtney, Nancy Bowman, Jenna McCall, David Fisher, Jordan Ribariu, Kevin Schmit, Amanda Franks, Dana Setters, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Samantha Hamilton, Katrina Allen, Stacy Fletcher, George Arnold, Rhonda Scott, David Huser, Paul Boggs, Tara Brown, Nicholas Battista, David Shempert, Tammy Dale, Bunnavuth Chhun, Rebecca Applegate, Arletta Bowling, Nicole Baker, Brandon Schoborg, Heather McCann, Dawn Merland, Alyssa Hall, Gerald Botner, Shannon Koehler, Joshua Ault, Janet Campbell, Hillary Levandofsky, Bert Stidham, Thomas Barth, Amber Work, Jason Romer, Alyssa Jackson, Kayla Burton, Stephanie Hawks, Diana Ashcraft, Minuet Healy, Paul Baker, Samantha Redrow, Deena Borchers, Sydney Jones, John Collins, Kevin Elfers, Cindy Bartlett, Traci Matthews, Tyler McKnight, Kevin Hunley, Joetta Nafe, Laura Weisbecker, Jessica Cochran, Margie Eversole, Michelle Byar, Harry Reynolds, Kathryn Curley, Robert Wilson, Ryan Miller, Dawn Dunklin, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Tammy Hughes, Ali Scully, Denise Helton, Richard Stanfield, Kyra McClendon, Michelle Beavan, Christopher Haynes, Celeste Hoffman, Christina Rutter, Christopher Atwood, Tim Moore, Charles Nelson, David Smith, Erma Jean Gilbert, James Cuzzort, Rachel Jones, Paul Wilson, James Albers, Larry Krech, Cory Wright, Todd Ray, Shirley Mains, Dannie Owens, Gordon Rister, Deborah Sturdivant, Brandon Webster, Michael Watkins, Adrienne Thomas, Carolyn Hursong, Billie Jane Moore, Brad Arnold, Katherine Prater, Larry Stephen Hayes, Tammie Little, Wendy Oberlander, Jenny Grimm, Evelyn Young, Tonya Neal, Thomas Augst, Gayle Bachmann, Judy Beck, James McCain, Karen Leger, Joseph Wilder, Jack Buskirk, Karen Feltner, Denise Benge, Michael Hillard, Joe Rutter, Michelle Walters, Beth Leisring, Alex Taylor, Valerie Reeves, John Richardson, Cathleen Weber, Sherri Allen, Kelly Martin, Kim Schmit, Martha Hutton, Sherry Kidd, Margaret Radenheimer, Vicki Wallace, Brian Thien, Zachary Stacy, Brenda Shell, Stephanie Jobe, Tracey Walsh, Latoya Bradshaw, Deborah Roark, Amanda Ayres, Valarie Kopp, Nancy Pfetsch, Tammy Mann, Kent Reynolds, Susan Griffin, Robert Jr. Houghton, Michael Cook, Kelly Hennessy, Sophia White, Chris Clark, Scott Daniel, Heather Schuster, Lynn Haley, Christine Goldstein, Mary Ravenscraft, Ryan Tackett, Linda Favaron, Timothy Schulze, Marsha Martin, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Angela Ferrell, James Brown, Jonathan Atwell, Michael Sander, Vicky Mains, Shannon Wallace, Kimberly Luse, Misty Emerson, Michelle Sizemore, Tamala Lovette, Julie Freeman, Leslie Powers, Deborah Kidd, Lisa Reynolds, Brittany Brewer, Ron Wright, Patricia Boone, Barbara Hensley, Samantha Mink, Tiffany Meadows, Brenda Butler, Karen Miller, William Benton, Jeff Remley, Ralph Dawson, George Hutchinson, Judge Robert Moore, Joseph Baumgardner, Timothy Whalen, Jennifer Ballinger, Sandra Radeke, Susan Schock, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Ruhama Hall, Douglas Sr. Hayes, Joan Jones, Carol Wilson, Robbie Gregory, Teresa Nichols, Mike Koelblin, Melissa Cotter, Jacklen Upchurch, Sarra Mueller, Charlotte King, Kelly Engle, Josh Kauffman, Troy Beckelhimer, Doris Botner, Amy Fuller, Ryan Tanner, Todd Green, Regina Wesley, Tom Pritchard, Terry Collins, Derek Mayfield, Katie Lehmkuhl, Randall Metcalf, Chris Scheper, Kelly Robinson, Gloria Greene, Donna Smallwood, Rita Hounchell and Shandon Simmons
Defendant: Hamilton County Clerk's Office, Hon. Mark Schweikert, Aftab Pureval and Hamilton County, Ohio
Case Number: 1:2018cv00699
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss of Hamilton County Clerk of Court Aftab Pureval in His Individual Capacity and Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 12/12/2018) by Defendant Aftab Pureval. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (De Marco, Paul)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 12/6/2018. by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) Modified on 11/16/2018 (jlw).
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #5 Defendant Judge Mark Schweikert's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (New date requested 12/4/2018) by Plaintiffs Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Joshua Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Nicholas Barkey, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelhimer, Nancy Begley, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Michelle Byrd, Patrick Callagan, Doug Callahan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary Coots, Janet Cornett, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Jean Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Samantha Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Sr. Hayes, Larry Stephen Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Jr. Houghton, Robert Sr. Houghton, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Martha Hutton, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Joan Jones, Kelly Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Jacqueline Judkins, Josh Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marscheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Brandon Mathis, Traci Matthews, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Tom Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Jane Moore, Debbie Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Ali Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Jr. Stamps, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Bert Stidham, Deon Jr. Stigall, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Winter, Robert) Modified entry to create link on 11/14/2018 (mr).
November 2, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Aftab Pureval answer due 11/21/2018. (sct)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT AFTAB PUREVAL IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY TO MOVE OR PLEAD, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6.1 by Defendant Aftab Pureval. (De Marco, Paul)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M De Marco for Defendant Aftab Pureval (De Marco, Paul)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Albert Winter, Jr for Plaintiffs (Winter, Robert) Modified on 11/1/2018 (jlw).
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Hamilton County Clerk's Office, Hamilton County, Ohio, Aftab Pureval. (Schaefer, Christian)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mark Schweikert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Order) (Zaring, Lisa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Hamilton County Clerk's Office, Hamilton County, Ohio, Aftab Pureval, Mark Schweikert. Hamilton County Clerk's Office served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018; Hamilton County, Ohio served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018; Aftab Pureval served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018; Mark Schweikert served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (jlw)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: A summons and complaint have been sent via certified mail by the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on October 10, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (jlw)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eh)
October 4, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief, Costs, And Attorney Fees For Constitutional Violation against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6625093), filed by Frieda Aaron, Patricia Adams, Michelle Agee, Laura Aker, James Albers, Jimmy Allen, Katrina Allen, Sherri Allen, Rebecca Applegate, Brad Arnold, George Arnold, Diana Ashcraft, Brian Atkins, Thomas Atkinson, Jonathan Atwell, Christopher Atwood, Thomas Augst, Joshua Ault, Amanda Ayres, Gayle Bachmann, Caidan Bailey, Nicole Baker, Paul Baker, Jennifer Ballinger, Nicholas Barkey, Thomas Barth, Cindy Bartlett, Kimberly Bates, Laura Batsche, Nicholas Battista, Jody Bauer, Joseph Baumgardner, Steven Bayliss, Michelle Beavan, Phyllis Bechtold, Judy Beck, Troy Beckelhimer, Nancy Begley, Cathy Beil, Terry Beil, Mackenzie Bender, Denise Benge, Nick Benge, Antoinette Benjamin, Shawnda Benton, William Benton, Denise Bess, Leona Beyer, Trey Billing, Edythe Bishop, Anthony Bode, Kaitlyn Boggs, Paul Boggs, Jennifer Bookman, Patricia Boone, Deena Borchers, Doris Botner, Gerald Botner, Arletta Bowling, Nancy Bowman, Penny Brackett, Latoya Bradshaw, Rebekah Brady, Christina Brashear, Melissa Braucher, Dominque Bray, Lindsey Bray, Brittany Brewer, Jeremy Brewer, Randy Brewer, Sharon Brice, Michael Brophy, Richard Brorein, Dawn Lee Ann Brown, James Brown, Tara Brown, Jonathan Brunner, Angela Buechel, Kayla Burton, Vicki Buschur, Kathleen Bushelman, Jack Buskirk, Brenda Butler, Michelle Byar, Michelle Byrd, Patrick Callagan, Doug Callahan, Janet Campbell, Robert Campbell, Stephen Carmen, Andrew Carr, Ashley Casey, Bunnavuth Chhun, Tonya Chisman, Chris Clark, Jessica Cochran, John Collins, Terry Collins, Elizabeth Compo, David Conger, Kenneth Conger, Brenda Conley, Dana Conley, Lisa Conley, Francene Cook, Michael Cook, Gary Coots, Janet Cornett, Melissa Cotter, Michael Cotter, Barbara Couch, Sandra Couch, Eric Courtney, Michael Crail, Karen Crissinger, Carrie Crowe, Forrest Crowe, Joi Crowe, Joy Cullins, Kathryn Curley, James Cuzzort, William Dabney, Tammy Dale, Scott Daniel, Joseph Davis, Nellie Davis, Ralph Dawson, Ollie Deaton, Stefanie Deaton, Damon Deck, Sandra Dennis, Robert Densler, Kristine Dority, Carolyn Dotson, Deborah Doyle, Douglas Drafts, Patrick Dugan, Billy Dugger, Dawn Dunklin, Jacob Durham, Darrell Earls, Chris Ebbing, Mona Eder, Kevin Elfers, Richard Elliott, Misty Emerson, Kelly Engle, Brenda Errgang, Tracy Esselman, Margie Eversole, Arlene Fait, Linda Favaron, Jacob Feltner, Karen Feltner, Jean Fenner, Angela Ferrell, Damian Fields, Caela Finnell, David Fisher, Troy Fite, Alyssa Flatt, Stacy Fletcher, Josh Fogel, Francine Ford, Shamiya Ford, Lennie Fossett, Angelina Foster, Amanda Franks, Joann Frazier, Julie Freeman, Amy Fuller, Judith Gardner, Crystal Garrison, Christine Geralds, Mary Gerbus, Erma Jean Gilbert, Christine Goldstein, Donna Good, Greg Graber, Maurice Grabow, Erin Greelish, Todd Green, Gloria Greene, Robbie Gregory, Carla Griessman, Susan Griffin, Jenny Grimm, Melissa Habermehl, Kevin Haggard, Lenora Haggard, Taura Halbert, Lynn Haley, Alyssa Hall, David Hall, Ruhama Hall, Dorothea Hamilton, Samantha Hamilton, Denise Hamilton, Courtney Hammons, Gerald Hammons, Ryan Handorf, Timothy Hannon, David Harris, Adam Hartman, Kevin Hartness, Jessica Hastings, Wayne Hatfield, Sara Hauenstein, Stephanie Hawks, Douglas Sr. Hayes, Larry Stephen Hayes, Christopher Haynes, Minuet Healy, Denise Helton, Evelyn Helton, Theresa Helton, Debra Henderson, Kelly Hennessy, Barbara Hensley, Ryan Hensley, Kathy Hersley, Jennifer Hickey, Karen Higginbothan, Alissa Hightchew, Michael Hillard, Dirk Hitchcock, Celeste Hoffman, Luke Holcomb, Cathy Holley, Loretta Hon, Chelsea Hortman, Robert Jr. Houghton, Robert Sr. Houghton, Ricky Hounchell, Rita Hounchell, Sharon Howard, Kathryn Howell, Tammy Hughes, Kevin Hunley, Carolyn Hursong, David Huser, George Hutchinson, Martha Hutton, Irene Hyde, Jeffrey Hyde, Elsa Ieraci, Alyssa Jackson, Melvin James, Tracy Janson, Kimberly Jenkins, Sarah Jessee, Stephanie Jobe, Amber Johnson, Chelsea Johnson, Karen Johnson, Roger Johnson, Sara Jonas, Joan Jones, Kelly Jones, Rachel Jones, Sydney Jones, Tammy Jones, Jacqueline Judkins, Josh Kauffman, Katelyn Kauffman, Michele Keplinger, Martha Kibler, Deborah Kidd, Sherry Kidd, Vivian Kiefer, Charlotte King, Maggie Knauer, Amanda Koch, Rose Koehler, Shannon Koehler, Mike Koelblin, Valarie Kopp, Laura Kathleen Kranbuhl-McKee, Larry Krech, Brandon Lacinak, Natasha Lainhart, Victoria Landrum, Lyndon Langford, Maurine Langford, Tom Lantry, Patricia Legendre, Karen Leger, Katie Lehmkuhl, Beth Leisring, Sandra Lemmel, Ailene Levan, Hillary Levandofsky, Adrian Lilly, Derek List, Lynne List, Tammie Little, Tamala Lovette, Richard Lozier, Kimberly Luse, Kenneth Mahlenkamp, Shirley Mains, Vicky Mains, Tammy Mann, Jack Marscheschi, Timothy Marshall, Julie Martin, Kelly Martin, Marsha Martin, Stacy John Martin, Robert Masters, Brandon Mathis, Traci Matthews, Donald Mauntel, Kimberly Mayer, Derek Mayfield, James McCain, Jenna McCall, Heather McCann, Christopher McCaughey, Hiram McCauley, Kyra McClendon, Barbara McClure, Kevin McDonald, Marcella McDonald, Grant McKenney, Candi McKinney, Tyler McKnight, Teresa McMillen, Mark McMurren, Kameron McNeal, Kerry McNeal, Tonia McQueary, Tiffany Meadows, Dawn Merland, Tiffany Messerschmidt, Randall Metcalf, Diane Meyer, Tom Meyers, Lyndsey Middendorf, Karen Miller, Ryan Miller, Samantha Mink, Vera Moffitt, Junior Monroe, Billie Jane Moore, Debbie Moore, Donald Moore, Robert Moore, Stephanie Moore, Tim Moore, William Moore, Reba Morgan, Robert Mounce, Sarra Mueller, Stephanie Mueller, Jennifer Myers, Joetta Nafe, Tonya Neal, Charles Nelson, Gary Neu, Marjorie Newman, Teresa Nichols, Rahmann Nisbett, Michelle Noble, Gail Nordeman, Ruvimbo Nyemba, Wendy Oberlander, Michael Odulana, Timothy Osborn, Dannie Owens, Haley Payne, Jeff Peddicord, Duane Pelfrey, Angela Pennington, Nancy Pfetsch, Clarence Phillips, Heather Pickett, Crystal Pierce, Jeffrey Poff, Sheila Pogue-Krabacher, Jeff Potts, Antoine Powell, Bryan Powers, Leslie Powers, Katherine Prater, Tom Pritchard, Sherri Puckett-Morrissette, Carol Pummell, James Pumpelly, Sandra Radeke, Margaret Radenheimer, Mary Ravenscraft, Todd Ray, Samantha Redrow, Danielle Reed, Mark Reed, Valerie Reeves, Holly Reifenberger, Jeff Remley, Derrill Reynolds, Harry Reynolds, Kent Reynolds, Lisa Reynolds, Jordan Ribariu, John Richardson, Jason Riley, Gordon Rister, Deborah Roark, Theresa Robbinson-Woods, Kelly Robinson, Debbie Rodriguez, David Rohling, Jason Romer, Dorothy Rose, Carol Ross, Sandra Roundtree, Ronald Rowley, Josh Roy, Robert Runtz, Christina Rutter, Joe Rutter, Mike Sand, Michael Sander, Chris Scheper, Robin Schiller, Joseph Schimmel, Kevin Schmit, Kim Schmit, Patrick Schmit, Brandon Schoborg, Susan Schock, Paul Scholz, Andrew Schultz, Timothy Schulze, Heather Schuster, Ronald Schuster, Delores Scott, Rhonda Scott, Ali Scully, Ruthie Sears, Sara Selm, Dana Setters, Glenna Shafer, Asia Shannon, Brenda Shell, David Shempert, Charlann Shepherd, Patricia Shott, Shandon Simmons, Karen Sisson, Michelle Sizemore, Heather Slayback, Donna Smallwood, David Smith, Staci Smith, Orris Smoote, David Snider, Sherry Spangenberg, Zachary Stacy, Eddie Stallings, Earl Jr. Stamps, Richard Stanfield, Patrick Stephenson, Tempie Stephenson, Bert Stidham, Deon Jr. Stigall, Sierra Stratman, Deborah Sturdivant, Ryan Tackett, Ryan Tanner, Alex Taylor, Karen Taylor, Kathleen Teslcher, Ben Thaeler, Brittany Theilman, Brian Thien, Edward Thiessen, Adrienne Thomas, Clara Tubbs-Hill, Connie Underwood, Kim Underwood, Jacklen Upchurch, Jordan Vance, Brooke Vandervort, Ashley Walker, Shannon Wallace, Vicki Wallace, Katherine Walls, Lindsey Walsh, Tracey Walsh, Michelle Walters, Helen Ward, Haley Warren, Michael Watkins, Elaine Waxler, Daniel Webber, Cathleen Weber, Brandon Webster, Laura Weisbecker, Kirstin Weisman, Regina Wesley, Timothy Whalen, Violet Whalen, Lonnie Wheeler, Sophia White, Joseph Wilder, Troy Wilder, Benjamin Williams, Kelly Williams, Patrick Willoughby, Alisa Wilson, Carol Wilson, Jetton Wilson, Kenny Wilson, Paul Wilson, Paula Wilson, Robert Wilson, Terry Wilson, Vicky Wilson, Dawn Wingert, Priscilla Wittmeyer, William Wolder, Billy Wolsing, Carla Wooten, Amber Work, Deborah Worley, Teresa Worley, Cory Wright, Ron Wright, Cheryl Wyatt, Emanuel D. Wyatt, Veronica Yeakle, Evelyn Young, JoAnn Young, Judy Young, Keith Young, Corrine Zachry, Mary Zureick, Hannah Zymslo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form) (Maraan, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron et al v. Hamilton County Clerk's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Elliott
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Lilly
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Esselman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Callagan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harris
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Beyer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hatfield
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Warren
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Callahan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruvimbo Nyemba
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Doyle
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Spangenberg
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Zureick
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Brewer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Rose
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Langford
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Potts
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Helton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Griessman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thiessen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominque Bray
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brophy
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Young
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sr. Houghton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi McKinney
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Batsche
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joi Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Mathis
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Legendre
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Allen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edythe Bishop
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Keplinger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lacinak
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Haggard
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Mauntel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Deck
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caela Finnell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Knauer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Williams
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Reed
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Wheeler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Brewer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Payne
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruthie Sears
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gardner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Koehler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne List
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Buschur
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Shott
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Waxler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McCaughey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hartness
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Pummell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Cornett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirstin Weisman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hounchell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McClure
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bayliss
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Bray
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Casey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schuster
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Begley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Janson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Crissinger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Foster
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiram McCauley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Hamilton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Fields
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Willoughby
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bode
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Frazier
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Theilman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Jones
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wyatt
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Scott
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taura Halbert
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennie Fossett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Martin
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Wilder
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Walker
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Benjamin
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Messerschmidt
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Fenner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenna Shafer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Conley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Myers
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Howard
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Reifenberger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hickey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella McDonald
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mayer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Webber
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Meyer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Earls
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Dotson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Brunner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hannon
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Henderson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Walsh
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenzie Bender
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Kibler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahmann Nisbett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Graber
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Pickett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Marshall
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Nordeman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Landrum
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Stallings
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Densler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ailene Levan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlann Shepherd
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Wolsing
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Neu
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Runtz
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jessee
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek List
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Deaton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Thaeler
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Greelish
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hammons
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Garrison
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Buechel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dugger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Marscheschi
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Crowe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Byrd
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caidan Bailey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schimmel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dabney
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Underwood
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Eder
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Powers
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Jonas
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Conger
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry McNeal
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin James
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia McQueary
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Deaton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Drafts
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Kauffman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francene Cook
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Holley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda Aaron
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Ebbing
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bookman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bess
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Boggs
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Osborn
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Ieraci
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Riley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Howell
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bates
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Agee
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Couch
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orris Smoote
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Odulana
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Benge
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jones
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Handorf
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Jr. Stigall
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Beil
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Coots
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Feltner
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lozier
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Newman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Stephenson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Pelfrey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lee Ann Brown
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Worley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Schiller
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Selm
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Meyers
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Reed
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Vandervort
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrill Reynolds
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Errgang
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Durham
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bushelman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Smith
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gerbus
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McDonald
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Couch
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Atkins
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Haggard
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameron McNeal
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tempie Stephenson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cotter
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Walls
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Masters
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Conley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Hamilton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moore
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Jr. Stamps
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sand
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Worley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Brady
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Geralds
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamiya Ford
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Poff
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crail
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Shannon
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Young
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hall
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Puckett-Morrissette
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Ward
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sisson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Snider
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Compo
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rowley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetton Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reba Morgan
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Stratman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Grabow
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Bauer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Wittmeyer
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jenkins
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Hauenstein
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Monroe
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Fogel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Davis
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wolder
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Judkins
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Fite
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Yeakle
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Koch
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Pierce
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Helton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Brackett
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trey Billing
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy John Martin
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Rodriguez
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Zymslo
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Holcomb
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hyde
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Roy
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Habermehl
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Moffitt
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Lantry
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Adams
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Atkinson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Bechtold
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Carr
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Chisman
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Carmen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hastings
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnda Benton
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brorein
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rohling
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mounce
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa McMillen
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Braucher
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Scholz
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Flatt
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Fait
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Tubbs-Hill
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Teslcher
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Schmit
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lemmel
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Dority
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hensley
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Aker
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Wingert
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk Hitchcock
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Young
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Hon
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Robbinson-Woods
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Roundtree
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Barkey
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin M Maraan, II
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Maraan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing |