HHS Capital, LLC v. Equity Max Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HHS Capital, LLC and PCI, LLC.
Defendant: Garrett Stevenson, TLR Investment Group, Equity Max Network, LLC and Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00732
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 25 Response to Ojections (Doc. 24) to Report and Reccomendation (Doc.23) by Plaintiff HHS Capital, LLC. (Brown, Albert)
December 3, 2018 Filing 24 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations by Defendant Garrett Stevenson. (bjc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that Plaintiff's #8 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal be GRANTED, this matter be DISMISSED from the docket of the Court, and this matter be REMANDED to the state court. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/19/18. (sct)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #20 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/16/18. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 Order on Motion to Vacate, Order permitting Ross Carponelli to appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (Brown, Albert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #19 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Vacate #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Order by Defendant Garrett Stevenson. (eh)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Vacate #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/7/18. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Vacate #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (Brown, Albert)
November 2, 2018 Notice of Correction re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, This document was incorrectly filed. Counsel was notified and Clerk re-filed as Reply to Response to Motion and restricted #16 to court users only. (jlw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, MOTION to Vacate Stay of Proceedings filed by Plaintiff PCI, LLC.. (jlw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 *DISREGARD THIS ENTRY, IT WAS FILED IN ERROR* RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, MOTION to Vacate Stay of Proceedings, #12 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/30/2018. and REmand to State Court filed by Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Counsel Letter July 7, 2018) (Brown, Albert) Modified to restrict entry to court users only on 11/2/2018 (jlw).
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Vacate #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Garrett Stevenson. (bjc)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ross S. Carponelli. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/30/18. (wam)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, MOTION to Vacate Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendants Equity Max Network, LLC, Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC, Garrett Stevenson, TLR Investment Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (bjc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Secure Legal Counsel. by Defendants Equity Max Network, LLC, Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC. (bjc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6656535) of Ross Carponelli by Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (Brown, Albert)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying defendants' #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 10/25/2018. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendants Equity Max Network, LLC, Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC. (bjc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal, ( Responses due by 10/29/2018, Responses due by 11/9/2018), MOTION to Vacate Stay of Proceedings by Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court docket, #2 Exhibit Defendant Answer, #3 Exhibit State Court Decision, #4 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Order) (Brown, Albert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Albert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert T. Brown, Jr for Plaintiffs HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC. (Brown, Albert)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equity Max Network, LLC, Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC, Garrett Stevenson, TLR Investment Group, filed by HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (bjc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Garrett Stevenson. (bjc) Modified File Date on 10/19/2018 (bjc).
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equity Max Network, LLC, Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC, Garrett Stevenson, TLR Investment Group, filed by HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (bjc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Equity Max Network, LLC, Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC, Garrett Stevenson, TLR Investment Group, filed by HHS Capital, LLC, PCI, LLC.. (bjc)
October 18, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN035252 (bjc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1607010, filed by Garrett Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt, #4 State Court Documents) (bjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HHS Capital, LLC v. Equity Max Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLR Investment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Max Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isome Construction & Renovation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HHS Capital, LLC
Represented By: Brian C. Shrive
Represented By: Ross S. Carponelli
Represented By: Albert T. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCI, LLC.
Represented By: Ross S. Carponelli
Represented By: Albert T. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?