Anuwave LLC v. Federal Equipment Company

Plaintiff: Anuwave LLC
Defendant: Federal Equipment Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00747
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Equipment Company answer due 1/14/2019. (jlw)
December 21, 2018 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Federal Equipment Company. (Schoen, Ann)
December 6, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jean G. Vidal-Font for Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/6/18. (ba)
December 6, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola for Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/6/18. (ba)
November 28, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6695215) of Jean G. Vidal-Font by Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Vidal-Font) (Wernow, Howard)
November 28, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6695196) of Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola by Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Torres-Oyola) (Wernow, Howard)
October 31, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Equipment Company. (bjc)
October 31, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
October 30, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Anuwave LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
October 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Anuwave LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6660400), filed by Anuwave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent Number 8,295,862, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anuwave LLC v. Federal Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Equipment Company
Represented By: Ann Gallagher Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuwave LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Eugenio J. Torres-Oyola
Represented By: Jean G. Vidal-Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?