Gresham v. Family Dollar
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gresham
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Ohio Inc and Family Dollar
Case Number: 1:2018cv00772
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 12/17/2018. (jlw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Defendant Family Dollar. (Call, Jordan)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due to be filed with the Court by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/14/2018. (art)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Family Dollar. (Call, Jordan)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Family Dollar re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet and (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental civil cover sheet) (Call, Jordan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Family Dollar, filed by Jacqueline Gresham. Filed in Butler County Court of Common Pleas on10/4/2018 as case number 2018 10 2230 (jlw)
November 9, 2018 If this case is referred it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Family Dollar Stores of Ohio Inc, Dollar Tree, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Family Dollar Stores of Ohio Inc.. (Call, Jordan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County Common Pleas Court, case number 2018 10 2230 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6673767), filed by Family Dollar Stores of Ohio Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter November 6, 2018, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Email of November 7, 2018, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Secretary of State of Virginia form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Complaint) (Call, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gresham v. Family Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Gresham
Represented By: Eric Vincent Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Ohio Inc
Represented By: Jordan Call
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar
Represented By: Jordan Call
Represented By: Daniel A. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?