Troy Howards v. Fifth Third Bank
Plaintiff: Troy Howards
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 1:2018cv00869
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference regarding outstanding requests for production by Plaintiff held on 10/21/2020; Kevin Hulick, Stuart Scott, Andrea Gold, Jonathan Streisfeld, and Jeffrey Kaliel appeared for Plaintiff; Julie Brady and William Hawkins appeared for Defendant; while Defendant's #49 Motion to Dismiss remains pending, discovery related to the named Plaintiff only shall be produced. (ba)
October 1, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards of Supplemental Authority Regarding #49 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Roy v. ESL Federal Credit Union, #2 Exhibit 2 - McNeil v. Capital One Bank, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jones v. Lake Michigan Credit Union) (Scott, Stuart) Modified docket text and docket entry relationship on 10/2/2020 (kh).
August 19, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Vocaty v. Great Lakes Credit Union, #2 Exhibit 2 - Duncan v. Bancfirst, #3 Exhibit 3 - Brown v. Educators Credit Union, #4 Exhibit 4 - Baptiste v. GTE Federal Credit Union dba GTE Financial, #5 Exhibit 5 - Teel v. HAPO Community Credit Union, #6 Exhibit 6 - Darty v. Scott Credit Union, #7 Exhibit 7 - Young v. The Washington Trust Co.) (Scott, Stuart) Modified docket text on 8/20/2020 (kh).
June 22, 2020 Filing 76 Response re #75 Notice (Other),, of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Hawkins, William)
May 27, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Troy Howards re (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Romohr v. The Tennessee Credit Union, #2 Exhibit B - Perri v. Notre Dame Federal Credit Union, #3 Exhibit C - Garcia v. UMB Bank NA, #4 Exhibit D - Tisdale v. Wilson Bank and Trust, #5 Exhibit E - Ingram v. Teachers Credit Union, #6 Exhibit F - Noe v. City Natl Bank of W. Va, #7 Exhibit G - McMurrin v. America First Credit Union) (Scott, Stuart) Modified on 5/27/2020 (eh).
May 6, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Troy Howards (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Coleman v. Alaska USA Federal Credit Union, #2 Exhibit B - Order in Almon v. Independence Bank) (Scott, Stuart) Modified docket text on 5/7/2020 (eh).
March 27, 2020 Filing 73 Response re #72 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Authority re doc. #49 by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Hawkins, William) Modified on 3/30/2020 (eh).
March 18, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order in Perks v. TD Bank (03-17-2020)) (Scott, Stuart)
October 24, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #57 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order/Opinion in Tannehill v. Simmons Bank) (Scott, Stuart)
September 4, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Scott, Stuart)
August 16, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE by Defendant Fifth Third Bank of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 NF Lambert Memorandum and Opinion) (Hawkins, William)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: While this civil action was pending in the Central District of California, Plaintiff Troy Howards filed on behalf of the parties a #28 Stipulation to Extend Time to Move for Class Certification, subject to the Court's approval. Subsequently, the case was transferred to the Southern District of Ohio, and the #43 Calendar Order entered 02/01/2019 specifies that the Class Certification Motion Deadline is "to be determined." Accordingly, the #28 Stipulation, which appears on this Court's docket as an outstanding motion, is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 07/26/2019. (ba)
May 23, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Hawkins, William)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey M. Ostrow for Plaintiff Troy Howards. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/17/19. (ba)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Tropin for Plaintiff Troy Howards. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/17/19. (ba)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Streisfeld for Plaintiff Troy Howards. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/17/19. (ba)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Aizpuru for Plaintiff Troy Howards. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/17/19. (ba)
May 15, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6925049) of Jeffrey M. Ostrow Supreme Court of Florida - Certificate of Good Standing (Scott, Stuart)
May 15, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6925047) of Daniel Tropin Supreme Court of Florida - Certificate of Good Standing (Scott, Stuart)
May 15, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6925042) of Jonathan Streisfeld Supreme Court of Florida - Certificate of Good Standing (Scott, Stuart)
May 14, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6925049) of Jeffrey M. Ostrow by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Scott, Stuart)
May 14, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6925047) of Daniel Tropin by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Scott, Stuart)
May 14, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6925042) of Jonathan Streisfeld by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Scott, Stuart)
May 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 5/9/2019; Jeffrey Kaliel, Sophia Gold appeared for Plaintiff; Julie Brady, William Hawkins, Kevin Hulick appeared for defendants; a reply as to #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support shall be due by 5/23/2019; the defendant shall provide the Court with copy of the discovery request discussed for his review; a follow up conference to be set; date to be determined. (ba)
May 3, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Scott, Stuart)
April 23, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6894693) of Katherine Aizpuru by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Scott, Stuart)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hassan A. Zavareei for Plaintiff Troy Howards. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/9/19. (ba)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea R. Gold for Plaintiff Troy Howards. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/9/19. (ba)
April 5, 2019 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 26GIHAC7) of Hassan A. Zavareei (Scott, Stuart)
April 5, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6869358) of Andrea R. Gold (Scott, Stuart)
April 5, 2019 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards re #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 26GIHAC7) of Hassan A. Zavareei, #50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6869358) of Andrea R. Gold; These documents were filed without certificates of service which is required pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 5.2. To correct the filing, use the Certificate of Service event found under Criminal Events - Other Filings - Service of Process and link the event to the original filing when prompted. (ba)
April 4, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 26GIHAC7) of Hassan A. Zavareei by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Scott, Stuart)
April 4, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6869358) of Andrea R. Gold by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Scott, Stuart)
April 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Memorandum in Support by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alice Schloemer, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hawkins, William)
March 29, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by Plaintiff Troy Howards Service of Discovery Requests to Defendant (Scott, Stuart)
March 29, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart E Scott for Plaintiff Troy Howards (Scott, Stuart)
March 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 3/20/2019; Katherine Aizpuru and Jeffrey Kaliel appeared for plaintiff; Karl Fanter, Bill Hawkins, Julie Brady and Kevin Hulick appeared for defendant; defendant wishes to refile a motion to dismiss to which the Court will permit; the motion is due 4/3/19; a response is due 5/3/19; a follow up Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 11:30 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; a reply is due 5/17/19; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 2/1/19 for conferencing instructions (ba)
March 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Julie Singer Brady for Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/1/19. (ba)
February 25, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6809391) of Julie Singer Brady by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hawkins, William)
February 25, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by William Howard Hawkins, II for Defendant Fifth Third Bank (Hawkins, William)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that the Status Conference set for 3/7/19 is RESET to 3/20/2019 at 02:30 PM and remains set by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 2/1/19 for conferencing instructions (ba)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CALENDAR ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 12/6/2019. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert due by 1/20/2020. Defendant Primary Expert due by 1/6/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/29/2019. Expert Discovery 2/12/2020. Motions due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/1/19. (ba)
December 11, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
December 10, 2018 Judge Michael R. Barrett added. (er)
December 10, 2018 Filing 42 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-01963. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #13 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the Southern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. Terminiating #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Telephonic Appearance at Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 39 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. At the request of counsel, Jeffrey D. Kaliel, the court grants permission to participate via telephone for the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for December 10, 2018 at 11:00 AM. Must be a land line, cell phone not permitted. Counsel shall use the following conference call information: Number: (877) 848-7030; Access Code: 3751621. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ( IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Scheduling Conference set for Monday, December 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. is ADVANCED to be heard at 11:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY[Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for November 19, 2018, is continued to December 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Notice of Telephonic Appearance at Scheduling Conference (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 35 FED R. CIV. P. 26F REPORT filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 34 MINUTES OF #13 MOTION to Transfer Case and #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Motion Hearing held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Court hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. On the Courts own motion, the Motion to Transfer Case to U.S. District for the Southern District of Ohio #13 and Motion to Dismiss Case #21 are hereby continued from October 22, 2018 to November 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Guenther K. Fanter APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Fifth Third Bank, designating Defendant, Fifesa C Chow as local counsel. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. On the Courts own motion, the Motion to Transfer Case #13 , and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint #21 are hereby continued from October 15, 2018 to October 22, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Guenther K. Fanter pro hac vice to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fifth Third Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22543063) filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, identifying Fifth Third Bancorp. (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File motion for class certification filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply (Motion related), #26 , Reply (Motion related), #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District for the Southern District of Ohio Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) #13 Defendant Fifth Third Banks Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration of Alice Schloemer21 Defendant Fifth Third Banks Reply To Howards Opposition To Motion To Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration of Alice Schloemer21 filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District for the Southern District of Ohio Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) #13 filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District for the Southern District of Ohio Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) #13 Defendant Fifth Third Banks Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Motion To Transfer filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof; Declaration of Alice Schloemer filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teresa C. Chow, #2 Proposed Order) (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES #18 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court, having considered the Parties Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint, Etc. (Stipulation), and for good cause appearing, rules as follows. The Stipulation is hereby APPROVED.The hearing on Fifth Thirds pending Motion to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is continued from July 16, 2018 to October 15, 2018, at 10:00 a.m.; Fifth Thirds deadline to file and serve its responsive pleadings to the First Amended Class Action Complaint, which may include but not be limited to a Motion to Dismiss FAC, shall be extended from July 16, 2018 to August 15, 2018;Plaintiffs deadline to file and serve his oppositions to the Motion to Dismiss FAC and Motion to Transfer (collectively, the Motions) shall be September 10, 2018;Fifth Thirds deadline to file and serve its replies in support of the Motions shall be September 24, 2018;The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss FAC shall be set concurrently with the continued hearing on the Motion to Transfer, on October 15, 2018, at 10:00 a.m.;The Scheduling Conference in this action presently scheduled to take place on August 27, 2018 shall be continued to November 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m.;Counsel for the Parties shall hold their Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference of counsel no more than 21 days in advance of the continued scheduling conference; andThe Parties shall file and / or serve their initial disclosures, discovery plan, and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) report within 14 days of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference of counsel.The Parties may file supplemental briefs, not to exceed five pages, regarding the Motion to Transfer #13 no later than 09-10-18. IT IS SO ORDERED. ***NOTE: NEW INFORMATION*** (ab) Modified on 7/11/2018 (ab). [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: In light of the First Amended Complaint filed 07-02-18 #17 , the Motion to Dismiss Case #14 set for 07/30/18, is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fifth Third Bank answer now due 8/15/2018, re Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Fifth Third Bank amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Scheduling Conference set for August 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. This matter is set for a scheduling conference in Courtroom 9C, before the Honorable Dean D. Pregerson, located at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The conferencewill be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). Lead trial counsel shall attend the scheduling conference. See order for further details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District for the Southern District of Ohio Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) #13 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Te case number is missing the judge initials. The complete case number is : 2:18cv01963-DDP (ASx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Motion set for hearing on 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teresa C. Chow, #2 Proposed Order) (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District for the Southern District of Ohio Defendant Fifth Third Banks Notice Of Motion And Motion To Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teresa C. Chow, #2 Proposed Order) (Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fifth Third Bank answer now due 6/11/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank.(Attorney Teresa C Chow added to party Fifth Third Bank(pty:dft))(Chow, Teresa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. upon Fifth Third Bank waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2018, answer due 6/4/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Teresa Chow. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Name of court is missing. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards, (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21382896 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Troy Howards. (Attorney Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel added to party Troy Howards(pty:pla))(Kaliel, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 12/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troy Howards v. Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Howards
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Stuart E Scott
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Katherine Aizpuru
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Represented By: Hassan A Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan M. Streisfeld
Represented By: Daniel E. Tropin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: G. Karl Fanter
Represented By: Teresa C Chow
Represented By: William Howard Hawkins, II
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?