MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Abbvie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Abbvie Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Abbott Respiratory, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited and Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00892
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC re #2 Order to Show Cause, Notice of Filing of Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Order) (Turner, Tracy)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the review of plaintiffsClass Action Complaint, in which they state that the Judicial Panelon Multidistrict Litigation has ruled that the case should beconsolidated in an action in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania(Doc. 1 10), and the Court being advised, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file a copy of said Order on or before February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 02/06/2019. (bjc)
December 20, 2018 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Respiratory, LLC, Abbvie Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6725160), filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit D-3, #9 Exhibit D-4, #10 Exhibit D-5, #11 Exhibit D-6, #12 Exhibit D-7, #13 Exhibit D-8, #14 Exhibit D-9, #15 Exhibit D-10, #16 Exhibit D-11, #17 Exhibit D-12, #18 Exhibit D-13, #19 Exhibit D-14, #20 Exhibit D-15, #21 Exhibit D-16, #22 Exhibit D-17, #23 Exhibit D-18, #24 Exhibit D-19) (Turner, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Abbvie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Respiratory, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Tracy L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Tracy L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series
Represented By: Tracy L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?