Total Quality Logistics, LLC v. Riffe et al

Plaintiff: Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Del Mar Farms, Riffe J William, Hustle Logistics, Del Mar Farms Partners LTD, Del Mar Packing LLC and William J Riffe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00023
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Hustle Logistics. (Doyle, Thomas)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Del Mar Farms, Del Mar Farms Partners LTD, Del Mar Packing LLC. (Doyle, Thomas)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by William J Riffe. (Simon, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/4/19. (rrs)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order: Pursuant to agreement of the parties, the Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction: Written responses to interrogatories and requests for admissions (2/4/19); Defendants' answers or motions to dismiss (2/18/19); Documents to be produced by all parties (2/20/19); Depositions begin (3/4/2019); Plaintiff's renewed motion for preliminary injunction (3/26/19); Defendants' memorandum in opposition (4/2/19); Plaintiff's reply (4/5/19). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/4/19. (rrs)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #5 Defendant's motion to dissolve state court issued TRO. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/28/19. (rrs)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to dissolve it, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Del Mar Farms, Del Mar Farms Partners LTD, Del Mar Packing LLC, Hustle Logistics, William J Riffe. (Doyle, Thomas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to dissolve it filed by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Galvin, Charles)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to dissolve it by Defendants Del Mar Farms, Del Mar Farms Partners LTD, Del Mar Packing LLC, Hustle Logistics, William J Riffe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian L. Wright in Support of Joint Motion of Defendants to Dissolve the State Court Issued Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of William J. Riffe in Support of Joint Motion of Defendants to Dissolve the State Court Issued Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Clermont County Court of Common Pleas docket and event calendar) (Doyle, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Minute Entry and Notation Order: This case came before the Court pursuant to S.D. Ohio Civ. R. 65.1 for an informal conference by telephone regarding Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 3) on 1/10/19 at 11:00 a.m. Charles Galvin appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; Stephen Simon appeared on behalf of Defendant William Riffe; Tom Doyle appeared on behalf of Defendant Hustle Logistics and the Del Mar Defendants. The Court entered the following briefing schedule on Defendants' forthcoming motion challenging the propriety of the current temporary restraining order ("TRO") entered by the Clermont County Court of Common Pleas: Defendants' motion shall file their motion on or before 1/15/19; Plaintiff shall file a response on or before 1/18/19; Defendants shall file any reply before 1/21/19 at 12:00 p.m. After the Court rules on the forthcoming TRO motion to set aside the TRO, the parties shall promptly and jointly provide the Court with a proposed briefing schedule for the pending preliminary injunction motion (Doc. 3) via email to Chambers ((black_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov). The parties shall proceed with discovery immediately. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rrs)
January 9, 2019 Notation Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 65.1, the Court sets this case for an informal preliminary conference by telephone on 1/10/19 at 11:00 a.m. for the purpose of discussing Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access code: 8411435; Security code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rrs)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant William J Riffe Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Simon, Stephen)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Total Quality Logistics, LLC. Filed in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas on 12/14/2019. (jlw)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Del Mar Farms, Del Mar Farms Partners LTD, Del Mar Packing LLC, Hustle Logistics, William J Riffe, filed by Total Quality Logistics, LLC. Filed in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas on 12/14/2018 as case number 2018 CVH 01746. (jlw)
January 9, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL By All Defendants from Clermont County Common Pleas, case number 2018-CVH-01746 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6743002), filed by Riffe J William. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings Tabs 1-9) (Simon, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Quality Logistics, LLC v. Riffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Mar Farms
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Dempsey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riffe J William
Represented By: Stephen A Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hustle Logistics
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Dempsey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Mar Farms Partners LTD
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Dempsey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Mar Packing LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Dempsey Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Riffe
Represented By: Stephen A Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Charles Bradley Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?