Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Duke Energy Corporation

Plaintiff: SAFECO Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Duke Energy Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00038
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Duke Energy Corporation on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McLean, James)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
January 16, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct)
January 15, 2019 Judge Susan J. Dlott and Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman added. (pb)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Transfer: This Court, having GRANTED Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. #4 ), hereby transfers this matter to the Southern District of Ohio. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/10/19. (LC,S) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue is Granted. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/10/19. (Related Doc #4 ) (LC,S) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to change/transfer venue filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ostojic, B.) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause: This Court contacted counsel for plaintiff at the end of November regarding lack of venue. It appears from the face of the Complaint that venue is improper in the Northern District of Ohio. Counsel did not dispute the Court's assessment and indicated that plaintiff would file the proper motion, presumably a motion to transfer venue. At the end of December, having not received a motion from plaintiff, the Court again contacted counsel regarding the issue of improper venue. To date, no motion has been filed. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause within ten days of this Order as to why this case should not be dismissed for improper venue. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/19. (LC,S) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Notice by Clerk that Safeco Insurance Company of America failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (S,SR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Duke Energy Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9016114.. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ostojic, B.) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 1/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Duke Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFECO Insurance Company of America
Represented By: B. Robert Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?