Bi-State Insulation, Inc. v. Geiler Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BI-STATE INSULATION, INC.
Defendant: Geiler Company, Inc. and Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Litigation and to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Geiler Company, Inc.. (Surrey, Michael). Added MOTION to Compel on 2/26/2019 (eh).
February 13, 2019 Reset per doc. #11 Deadlines: Geiler Company, Inc. answer due 2/25/2019. (eh)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Geiler Company, Inc.. (Surrey, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bi-State Insulation, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, Voluntary Dismissal as to Capitol Specialty Insurance Company (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return Proof of service) (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Geiler Company, Inc.. Geiler Company, Inc. served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return Proof of service) (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bi-State Insulation, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, Civil Cover Sheet (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation, Geiler Company, Inc. (eh)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp)
January 17, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Geiler Company (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Capitol Specialty Insurance Company (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff BI-STATE INSULATION, INC.. (Hochscheid, Tabitha)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under Miller Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6753572), filed by BI-STATE INSULATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Award Notice Steam Heat, #3 Exhibit C -Subcontract Steam Heat, #4 Exhibit D- Payment Bond Steam Heat, #5 Exhibit E - Bond Claim affidavit Steam Heat, #6 Exhibit F- Bond Claim Denial Steam Heat, #7 Exhibit G- Final Pay Application Steam Heat, #8 Exhibit H -Award Notice Inpatitient Bed, #9 Exhibit I - Subcontract Inpatient Bed, #10 Exhibit J -Final Pay app Inpatient Bed, #11 Exhibit K- Subcontract Animal Res, #12 Exhibit L-Final Invoice Animal Res, #13 Exhibit M -Final Pay Application Animal Res, #14 Exhibit N - Statement of account) (Hochscheid, Tabitha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bi-State Insulation, Inc. v. Geiler Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geiler Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Surrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI-STATE INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: Tabitha M. Hochscheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?