Chen v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Xiafen Chen
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00045
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Toren. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/15/19. (rrs)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The United States of America. All Defendants. (Young, Michele)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6782025) of Peter Toren by Plaintiff Xiafen Chen. (Young, Michele)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The United States of America. (jlw)
January 22, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Xiafen Chen against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6758007), filed by Xiafen Chen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Young, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiafen Chen
Represented By: Michele Young
Represented By: Peter J. Toren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?