The Baldie Corporation v. FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Baldie Corporation
Defendant: FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00129
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff The Baldie Corporation. (Fecher, William)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Notation Order and Notice of Hearing: A Preliminary Pretrial Conference by telephone is set before Judge Timothy S. Black for 4/23/2019 at 11:30 a.m. COUNSEL SHALL CALL: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 8411435; Security Code: 123456, and wait for the Court to join the conference. Before the pretrial conference, counsel shall comply with the MANDATORY pre-preliminary pretrial conference between counsel, as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). THE REPORT MUST BE FILED 7 DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial procedures and forms can be found on our website at: https://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPBlack. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/26/19. (rrs)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.. (Powell, Eric)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc., filed by The Baldie Corporation in the Hamilton County Municipal Court Case Number 19CV01488. (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 2/21/2019 (bjc).
February 21, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/20/19. (ba)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.. (Powell, Eric)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Municipal Court, case number 19CV01488 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6801807), filed by FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint) (Powell, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Baldie Corporation v. FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Baldie Corporation
Represented By: William Brokate Fecher
Represented By: Alan J. Statman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Trade Networks Transport & Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By: Eric C Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?