Ledbetter et al v. Secoy et al
Plaintiff: Willa Kay Ledbetter and Alfred L. Ledbetter
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Michael N. Secoy and Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 1:2019cv00131
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
2 Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development answer due 4/22/2019. (km)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development's Motion for Extension of Time Until 4/22/2019 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant is further advised that all future motions for extension of time must comply with the provisions of S. D. Ohio Civ. R. 7.3(a). Failure to do so may result in the Court denying the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/4/2019. (km)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 4/22/2019. by Defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. (Castro, Margaret)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (King, Scott)
February 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 3/19/2019. (sct)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: This case is hereby ORDERED referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. who is authorized to rule on all motions except summary judgment motions; however, in no event will the Magistrate Judge grant any deadline extension that will impact final pretrial or trial settings. Any summary judgment motions will be decided by Judge Susan J. Dlott without the benefit of a Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation.. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/22/2019. (jlw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (new date: March 19, 2019) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (King, Scott)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allen King for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (King, Scott)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Michael N. Secoy, Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Willa Kay Ledbetter, Alfred L. Ledbetter in the Butler County Court of Common Pleas Case Number CV2019010086. (bjc)
February 21, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan J. Dlott for all further proceedings. Judge Michael R. Barrett no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/20/19. (ba)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV2019010086, filed by Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Docket Report) (Castro, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter et al v. Secoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Scott Allen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N. Secoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willa Kay Ledbetter
Represented By: Kyle D Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred L. Ledbetter
Represented By: Kyle D Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?