Martin et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Mary A. Martin and Donald L. Parks, Jr.
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB, Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00142
Filed: February 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time (Doc. 11) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their responses to the pending Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 7, 10) on or before 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/22/2019. (ss)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re Notice of Deadline, by Plaintiffs Mary A. Martin, Donald L. Parks, Jr.. (Menninger, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction New date requested 5/6/2019. by Plaintiffs Mary A. Martin, Donald L. Parks, Jr.. (Menninger, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 4/22/2019) by Defendant Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support, #2 Appendix Sheet, #3 Affidavit Docs) (Tarter, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC, Reisenfeld identifying Corporate Parent Reisenfeld for Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC.. (Tarter, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Tarter for Defendant Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC (Tarter, John)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/18/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB. (Hanneken, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB, The Bank of New York Mellon identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon for The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB.. (Hanneken, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Hanneken for Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB (Hanneken, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon for The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation.. (Hanneken, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Hanneken for Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation (Hanneken, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mary A. Martin, Donald L. Parks, Jr. re #1 Complaint,, CIVIL COVER SHEET (Menninger, Michael)
February 25, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (sct)
February 25, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint: Entry was filed without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel to file a completed civil cover sheet using the event Notice(Other). (sct)
February 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Litton Loan Servicing LP, Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6808523), filed by Mary A. Martin, Donald L. Parks, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Menninger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2004-16CB
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hanneken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reisenfeld & Associates, LPA, LLC
Represented By: John Tarter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey J Hanneken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A. Martin
Represented By: Michael Jonathan Menninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Parks, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Jonathan Menninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?