Gilliam-Gross v. Plaza Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Erika Gilliam-Gross
Defendant: Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC, and Plaza Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00143
Filed: February 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Erika Gilliam-Gross (Parker, Geoffrey)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due to be filed with the Court by 4/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/21/2019. (art)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Plaza Services, LLC. (Palumbo, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC,. (Palumbo, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses filed by All Defendants. (Palumbo, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines per 2/27/19 service date in docs. #4 & #5 : Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC, answer due 3/20/2019; Plaza Services, LLC answer due 3/20/2019. (eh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Plaza Services, LLC. Plaza Services, LLC served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Hilton, Jonathan) Modified docket text on 3/5/2019 (eh).
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC,. Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC, served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Hilton, Jonathan) Modified docket text on 3/5/2019 (eh).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz (vp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC, Plaza Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sct)
February 25, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
February 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC,, Plaza Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6808539), filed by Erika Gilliam-Gross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC, #3 Summons Form Plaza Services, LLC) (Parker, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam-Gross v. Plaza Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC,
Represented By: Michael Joseph Palumbo
Represented By: Anthony J Gingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Palumbo
Represented By: Anthony J Gingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Gilliam-Gross
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?