Berens v. CSX Transporation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Scott R. Berens
Defendant: CSX Transporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00147
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of H. David Leibensperger (Reed, Kenneth)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Perry Matthew Darby (Reed, Kenneth)
April 24, 2019 Notice of Correction re #5 and #6 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Motions were unsigned. Counsel to file signature pages using the event Notice(Other). (sct)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Perry Matthew Darby by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Reed, Kenneth)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of H. David Leibensperger by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Reed, Kenneth)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CSX Transporation, Inc., CSX Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transporation, Inc... (Carnes, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CSX Transporation, Inc.. (Carnes, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSX Transporation, Inc. (sct)
February 26, 2019 ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CSX Transporation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6809329), filed by Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Reed, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berens v. CSX Transporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transporation, Inc.
Represented By: James R Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott R. Berens
Represented By: Kenneth R. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?