Kolenich v. Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. James Kolenich and James E. Kolenich
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. d/b/a The Cincinnati Enquirer and Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00153
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff James E. Kolenich (Lewis, Cornelius)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/3/2019. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
April 11, 2019 Clerks Office received Exhibit A to Declaration of Phillip Didion,forwarded to the chambers of Judge Barrett. (bjc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gannett Co., Inc. for Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc... (Greiner, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren William Ford for Defendant Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. (Ford, Darren)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OF MANUALLY FILING EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF PHILLIP DIDION (Greiner, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monroe Trombly, #2 Declaration of Phillip Didion) (Greiner, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. (eh)
February 27, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. d/b/a The Cincinnati Enquirer ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6811668), filed by James Kolenich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Lewis, Cornelius)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolenich v. Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. James Kolenich
Represented By: Cornelius Carl Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Kolenich
Represented By: Cornelius Carl Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. d/b/a The Cincinnati Enquirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Greiner
Represented By: Darren William Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?