Fry v. General Revenue Corporation
Plaintiff: Sharon Fry
Defendant: General Revenue Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00172
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Susan J Dlott
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Greenwald. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 5/2/19. (wam)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6905112) of Michael L. Greenwald by Plaintiff Sharon Fry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Weiss, Ronald)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due to be filed with the Court by 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/25/2019. (art)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants General Revenue Corporation, Navient Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Navient Corporation for General Revenue Corporation.. (Yeagley, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by General Revenue Corporation. (Yeagley, David)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting defendant's unopposed #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. New date requested 4/26/2019. General Revenue Corporation answer due 4/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 3/26/2019. (art)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 4/26/2019. by Defendant General Revenue Corporation. (Yeagley, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant General Revenue Corporation. (Weiss, Ronald)
March 6, 2019 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 4] - restricted at request of counsel for filing error. Counsel to refile. (eh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 [FORMER DOC. 4 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.] SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant General Revenue Corporation. General Revenue Corporation served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Weiss, Ronald) Modified on 3/6/2019 (eh).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlot REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz (vp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Revenue Corporation. (eh)
March 5, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against General Revenue Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6822643), filed by Sharon Fry. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weiss, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fry v. General Revenue Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Fry
Represented By: Ronald Scott Weiss
Represented By: Michael L Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Revenue Corporation
Represented By: David D Yeagley
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?