Norman et al v. Superior Credit Union, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fred A Norman and Lydia Norman
Defendant: Perry Lunhe, Tom Hopper, Jim Zahneis and Superior Credit Union, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00250
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff Fred A Norman's Motion for Extension of Time to the extent that Plaintiff is granted an additional 30 days, through and including 8/9/2019, in which to supplement Plaintiffs' memoranda in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #14 #15 . Plaintiffs are advised that, absent extreme good cause shown, no further extensions of time will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 7/10/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Fred A Norman. (bjc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion (bjc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman. (bjc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman. (bjc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' First Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent that Plaintiffs are granted an additional 14 days, through and including 7/8/2019 in which to file their response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/24/2019. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (bjc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman. (eh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman. (jlw)
June 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #10 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio Pro Hac vice Rules as to Attorney, Clerk's Office verified that the attorney mentioned in the notice is admitted to practice in the Southern District of Ohio. (bjc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Thomas Weitholter (jlw) Modified Docket Text on 6/5/2019 (bjc).
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Tom Hopper, Perry Lunhe, Superior Credit Union, Inc., Jim Zahneis. (Teeters, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendants Tom Hopper, Perry Lunhe, Superior Credit Union, Inc., Jim Zahneis of Filing of Defendants' Proposed Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Proposed Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) (Teeters, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Tom Hopper's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Tom Hopper. (Teeters, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendants Tom Hopper, Perry Lunhe, Superior Credit Union, Inc., Jim Zahneis of Filing of Affidavit of Keith Eiden (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Keith Eiden) (Teeters, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendants Tom Hopper, Perry Lunhe, Superior Credit Union, Inc., Jim Zahneis of Filing of Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Teeters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeffrey R. Teeters, #2 Exhibit 8-3-2018 Order, #3 Exhibit A1404308 Docket, #4 Exhibit A1404308 Complaint, #5 Exhibit A1404308 Answer, #6 Exhibit A1404308 Memo Contra Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit A1404308 Magistrate's Decision, #8 Exhibit 1:15-bk-13069 Docket, #9 Exhibit 1:15-bk-13069 Order of Dismissal, #10 Exhibit A1404308 4-10-2019 Entry, #11 Exhibit A1404308 Objections and Motion to Vacate, #12 Exhibit 1:15-bk-13069 10-2-2017 Order) (Teeters, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 6/7/2019. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants Cinco Credit Union, Superior Credit Union, Jim Zanheis, and Perry Luhn's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Teeters, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sct)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Fred A Norman, Lydia Norman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (sct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman et al v. Superior Credit Union, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred A Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Lunhe
Represented By: Jeffrey R Teeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hopper
Represented By: Jeffrey R Teeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Zahneis
Represented By: Jeffrey R Teeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Credit Union, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Teeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?