H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Defendant: SLC Group, Inc. and Sharon L. Clark
Case Number: 1:2019cv00349
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Set Deadlines per doc. #4 : Sharon L. Clark answer due 6/20/2019; SLC Group, Inc. answer due 6/20/2019. (eh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Sharon L. Clark, SLC Group, Inc.. Sharon L. Clark served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019; SLC Group, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Gustavson, William) Modified docket text on 6/10/2019 (eh).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sharon L. Clark, SLC Group, Inc. (sct)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. To each Defendant (Gustavson, William)
May 9, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6918115), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?